McDaniel et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Louisiana Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Brian A Jackson |
Referred: | Richard L Bourgeois, Jr |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00552 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 09, 2024 |
Case in other court: | 23rd Judicial District Court, Parish of Ascension, 140567 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 4:27 AM CDT |
Defendant
State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mia McDaniel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shannon McDaniel
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
90 Day Conference Order
Thu 07/18 6:30 PM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: A Telephone Scheduling Conference is set for 9/26/2024 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Counsel for Plaintiff(s) shall initiate the call to all parties then contact the Court at (225) 389-3602. Status Report due by 9/12/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/18/2024. (SGO) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 07/10 4:23 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Norris, Meaghan) |
|
utility
Motion(s) Referred
Wed 07/10 10:33 AM
MOTION(S) REFERRED:6 MOTION to Substitute Certificate of Interested Persons . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC) |
||
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Pleading (In Order to Correct Deficiency)
Wed 07/10 2:30 PM
ORDER granting6 MOTION to Substitute Certificate of Interested Persons filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. The Clerk's Office shall substitute the attached Certificate of Interested Persons (R. Doc. 6-1) in place of the original Certificate of Interested Persons (R. Doc. 2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/10/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard) |
||
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Substitute Pleading (In Order to Correct Deficiency)
Tue 07/09 4:30 PM
MOTION to Substitute Certificate of Interested Persons by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(Norris, Meaghan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Pleading; Certificate of Interested Persons, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Pleading; Order | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of (other)
Tue 07/09 8:33 AM
NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement 1 Notice of Removal, by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Norris, Meaghan) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 07/09 8:30 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.. (Norris, Meaghan) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of (other)
Tue 07/09 8:27 AM
NOTICE of All Parties Remaining in This Action 1 Notice of Removal, by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Norris, Meaghan) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate of Interested Persons
Tue 07/09 8:22 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company identifying Affiliate/Interested Person State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Affiliate/Interested Person Aaron Godbey, Affiliate/Interested Person Devlan Melancon, Affiliate/Interested Person Michael Giardina, Affiliate/Interested Person Dante Cortello, Affiliate/Interested Person Godbey Giardina Law Group, LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Mia McDaniel, Affiliate/Interested Person Shannon McDaniel, Affiliate/Interested Person State Farm Fire and Casualty Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.. (Norris, Meaghan) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal (Complete Case Opening First)
Tue 07/09 8:13 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 23rd Judicial District Court, Parish of Ascension, Case Number 140567. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAMDC-2773882), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Norris, Meaghan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Petition, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Citation, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C-Policy, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D-State Court Record, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E-Certificate of Compliance, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet |