Shores v. Taylor et al
Mississippi Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Taylor B Mcneel |
Referred: | Robert P Myers, Jr |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00209 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 09, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Response to Order
Mon 08/12 11:10 AM
Response to Order re8 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND filed by Adam R. Shores(JCH) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
3
pgs
order
Order
Mon 08/05 3:51 PM
ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND: Plaintiff shall file a written response consistent with this Order by August 19, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 8/5/2024 (CRT) |
|
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Mon 08/05 3:49 PM
ORDER denying3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 8/5/2024 (CRT) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order Setting Payment Schedule Opsp6
Mon 08/05 3:47 PM
ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 8/5/2024 (CRT) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Acknowledgment of Receipt and Cert. (PSP3)
Fri 08/02 10:05 AM
Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 filed by Adam R. Shores.(JCH) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
6
pgs
order
Order Opsp2
Mon 07/29 9:34 AM
ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 8/28/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 7/29/2024 (CRT) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Appoint Counsel
Mon 07/15 10:42 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Adam R. Shores(JCH) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed IFP 1983
Tue 07/09 10:40 AM
*RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Adam R. Shores (RLW) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/09 10:36 AM
COMPLAINT against Jackson Co. Judicial System, Angel McIllrath, Calvin Taylor, filed by Adam R. Shores (RLW) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Assignment |