Ross v. Troy, City of et al
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert J White |
Referred: | Elizabeth A Stafford |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-11766 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:451 Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Jul 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 8:34 AM EDT |
Defendant
Robert Bruner
|
|
Defendant
Peter Hullinger
|
|
Defendant
Mark Miller
|
|
Defendant
Troy, City of
|
|
Plaintiff
Edward Ross
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Appear*
Tue 09/03 2:38 PM
ORDER Requiring Joint Discovery Plan and Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. ( Remote Scheduling Conference set for 10/1/2024 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Robert J. White. ) Microsoft Teams link will be emailed to counsel. (HRya) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 08/27 1:47 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Reliance on Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Berger, Michael) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Appearance
Tue 08/27 1:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T Berger on behalf of All Defendants. (Berger, Michael) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Appearance
Tue 08/27 1:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Carlito H. Young on behalf of All Defendants. (Young, Carlito) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
order
Text-Only Reassignment
Tue 08/13 9:06 AM
Text-Only Order of reassignment from District Judge Brandy R. McMillion to District Judge Robert J. White pursuant to Administrative Order 24-AO-020. (SSch) |
||
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
8
pgs
service
Summons Issued*
Wed 07/10 3:24 PM
SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra) |
|
notice
Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option
Wed 07/10 3:14 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (LGra) |
||
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
10
pgs
cmp
Civil Case - Complaint
Tue 07/09 12:16 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Edward Ross against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: BMIEDC-9855558 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Cortese, Nanette) |