Li v. The Kroger Company et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Sarah D Morrison |
Referred: | Chelsey M Vascura |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03679 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation |
Case Filed: | Jul 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 6:57 AM EDT |
Defendant
The Kroger Company
6417 Columbus Pike
Lewis Center, OH 43035 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cristy Li
4446 Mobile Drive Apt. 210
Columbus, OH 43220 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Ray Cantu
Terminated: 07/23/2024
1350 N. High Street
Columbus, OH 43201 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
order
Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order
Tue 09/03 2:16 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: The September 10, 2024 preliminary pretrial conference is VACATED. Joinder of Parties and Motions to Amend due by 9/30/2024. Initial Disclosures due by 9/30/2024. Primary expert reports, if any, must be produced by 30 days after a ruling on dispositive motions. Rebuttal expert reports, if any, must be produced by 60 days after a ruling on dispositive motions. Discovery due by 3/31/2025. Dispositive motions due by 5/9/2025. Response to Settlement Demand due by 9/10/2024. Mediation Deadline: 4/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 9/3/2024. (mas) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Fri 08/30 10:05 AM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendant The Kroger Company. (Collins, H.) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 08/20 4:51 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 9/10/2024 09:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Tue 08/13 3:18 PM
ANSWER to7 Amended Complaint filed by The Kroger Company. (Collins, H.) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 08/06 4:19 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re7 Amended Complaint. The Kroger Company answer due 8/13/2024. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 8/6/2024. (agm) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 08/05 12:21 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 8/13/2024. by Defendant The Kroger Company. (Collins, H.) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 07/23 2:02 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Kroger Company, filed by Cristy Li. (Probst, Erica) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 07/17 10:43 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re4 Complaint. Ray Cantu answer due 7/30/2024; The Kroger Company answer due 7/30/2024. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 7 17-2024 (agm) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 07/16 9:40 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 7/30/2024. by Defendants Ray Cantu, The Kroger Company. (Collins, H.) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/10 10:46 AM
COMPLAINT without JURY DEMAND filed originally in the Court of Common Pleas, Delaware County, Ohio on 6/11/2024, Case No. 24CVH-060569 by Cristy Li against The Kroger Company, et al. (mve) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/09 3:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by H. Devon Collins for Defendants Ray Cantu, The Kroger Company (Collins, H.) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 07/09 3:20 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Ray Cantu, The Kroger Company. (Collins, H.) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 07/09 1:12 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Delaware County Court of Common Pleas, case number 24CVH060569 ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10057273), filed by Ray Cantu, The Kroger Company. (Collins, H.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet |