Lake Charles Wholesale Furniture L L C v. Evanston Insurance Co
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | James D Cain, Jr |
Referred: | Thomas P Leblanc |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00908 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 09, 2024 |
Case in other court: | 33rd Judicial District Court, C-24-00187 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 4:12 AM CDT |
Defendant
Evanston Insurance Co
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lake Charles Wholesale Furniture L L C
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 08/14 3:28 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Evanston Insurance Co.(aty,Telep, Ryan) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 07/11 1:42 PM
Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal, with consent by Evanston Insurance Co. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/11/2024.(aty,Telep, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed order | ||
8 | 8
misc
Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement
Thu 07/11 1:22 PM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Evanston Insurance Co. (aty,Telep, Ryan) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 07/11 1:20 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Evanston Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Markel Corporation for Evanston Insurance Co. (aty,Telep, Ryan) |
|
6 | 6
order
Removal Order
Thu 07/11 11:23 AM
REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 7/11/2024. (crt,Jones, P) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/10 9:43 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lake Charles Wholesale Furniture L L C. (aty,Fournet, Douglas) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/10 11:32 AM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lake Charles Wholesale Furniture L L C. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement was filed within Corporate Disclosure Statement. (crt,Whitener, M) Modified to assign document number on 7/10/2024 (Whitener, M) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Wed 07/10 9:26 AM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/10/2024. (crt,Whitener, M) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Wed 07/10 9:13 AM
NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal, sent to Ryan Paul Telep, Douglas Cooper Fournet on behalf of Evanston Insurance Co, Lake Charles Wholesale Furniture L L C. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 7/24/2024. (crt,Whitener, M) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Wed 07/10 9:11 AM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal, sent to Ryan Paul Telep on behalf of Evanston Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/24/2024. (crt,Whitener, M) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Tue 07/09 1:05 PM
NOTICE of Removal from 33rd JDC Allen Parish, Case Number C-2024-187 (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-5992735) filed by Evanston Insurance Company.(Attorney Ryan Paul Telep added to party Evanston Insurance Company(pty:dft))(aty,Telep, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Civil cover sheet | ||
service
State Court Service Returned Executed (Removal Cases)
Wed 07/10 9:06 AM
STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Evanston Insurance Co answer due 7/16/2024. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found in Attachment #1 to Document #1, Notice of Removal (crt,Whitener, M) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 07/10 9:10 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. (crt,Whitener, M) |