Traore v. Menges
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | James R Cho |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-04759 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Jul 09, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 14, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 5:31 AM EDT |
Petitioner
Ouo Firyal Sandra Traore
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Patricia A. Menges
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
order
~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Wed 08/14 3:23 PM
Civil Case Terminated. See Dkt.8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (SGC) |
||
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 08/13 3:11 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ouo Firyal Sandra Traore Without Prejudice. (Yerman, Gary) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance Immigration/Social Security Cases
Tue 08/13 9:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob A Bashyrov on behalf of Patricia A. Menges (aty to be noticed) (Bashyrov, Jacob) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance Immigration/Social Security Cases
Tue 07/30 2:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by OFFICE OF IMMIGRATION LITIGATION - GENERIC on behalf of Patricia A. Menges (aty to be noticed) (OFFICE OF IMMIGRATION LITIGATION - GENERIC, ) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 07/22 11:37 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ouo Firyal Sandra Traore. Patricia A. Menges served on 7/19/2024, answer due 9/17/2024. (Yerman, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipts, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit USPS Online Proof of Delivery on U.S. Attorney Office EDNY | ||
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Tue 07/09 4:02 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (CV) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Tue 07/09 4:00 PM
Summons Issued as to Patricia A. Menges, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (CV) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Opportunity to Consent
Tue 07/09 3:57 PM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (CV) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Naturalization Hearing
Tue 07/09 2:02 PM
PETITION for Naturalization Hearing In The Nature Of Mandamus filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18051216, filed by Ouo Firyal Sandra Traore. (Yerman, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit |