Bang v. Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael J Newman |
Referred: | Peter B Silvain, Jr |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00195 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Jul 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 6:57 AM EDT |
Defendant
Secretary of Veterans Affairs
810 Vermont Avenue
Washington, DC 20420 |
|
Plaintiff
Susan Bang
533 Vine Street
Brookville, OH 45309 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 09/05 11:23 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint filed by Secretary of Veterans Affairs. (Tieger, Adam) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Wed 07/10 8:51 AM
Summons Issued as to Secretary of Veterans Affairs, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (srb) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/09 2:45 PM
COMPLAINT against Secretary of Veterans Affairs ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10057692), filed by Susan Bang. (Duwel, David) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Form |