Pet Passages, Inc. v. Safeburn LLC
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jose E Martinez |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-14218 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jul 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 8:18 AM EDT |
Defendant
Safeburn LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Pet Passages, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/18 2:05 PM
Summons Issued as to Safeburn LLC. (nwn) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es)
Thu 07/18 1:26 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Pet Passages, Inc. re1 Complaint, filed by Pet Passages, Inc. (Lott, Leslie) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
misc
Form AO 120/121
Wed 07/10 9:16 AM
FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (nwn) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint & Exhibits | ||
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Wed 07/10 9:10 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nwn) |
|
1 | 1
14
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/09 4:12 PM
COMPLAINT against Safeburn LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17664060, filed by Pet Passages, Inc..(Lott, Leslie) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E |