Fountain v. Sheqa Transportation, LLC et al
Mississippi Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Louis Guirola, Jr |
Referred: | Robert P Myers, Jr |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00211 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 09, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Harrison County Circuit Court, A2401-24-00075 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 4:57 AM CDT |
Defendant
Barhane Sengal Eman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sheqa Transportation, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dwayne Fountain
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
order
Case Management Order
Wed 08/28 11:48 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Jury Trial set during a three-week term of court beginning on 9/8/2025 09:00 AM in Courtroom 606 (Gulfport) before District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 8/19-20/2025 01:30 PM in Courtroom 606 (Gulfport) before District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. Discovery due by 3/3/2025. Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 9/30/2024. Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 9/30/2024. Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 12/2/2024. Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 1/2/2025. Designate Rebuttal Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 2/2/2025. Motions due by 3/17/2025. Settlement Conference set for 2/20/2025 09:30 AM in Courtroom 881 (Gulfport) before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. ADR Report due by 8/12/2025. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/19/2025. EDT: 4-5 days. Parties do not consent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. on 8/28/2024 (SR) |
|
minutes
Telephonic Case Management Conference
Wed 08/28 11:22 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 8/28/2024 with attorneys David P. Pitre and Clint D. Vanderver. (SR) |
||
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
discov
Notice of Service of Disclosure
Tue 08/20 4:09 PM
NOTICE of Service of Pre-Discovery Disclosure by Barhane Sengal Eman, Sheqa Transportation, LLC (Vanderver, Clint) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
discov
Notice of Service of Disclosure
Fri 08/02 11:22 AM
NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Pre-Discovery Disclosure by Dwayne Fountain (Pitre, David) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Certificate of Service
Fri 07/26 8:59 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dwayne Fountain(Pitre, David) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Certificate of Service, Secretary of State, Texas | ||
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/24 11:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Stuart Robinson, Jr on behalf of Barhane Sengal Eman, Sheqa Transportation, LLC (Robinson, John) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Rule 16(a) Initial Order
Mon 07/22 3:16 PM
Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/28/2024 09:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. (SR) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Wed 07/17 8:48 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #3. Incorrect event code selected. Counsel should have selected "Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)" which can be found under "Other Answers". Counsel does not need to refile. (wld) |
||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Jury Demand
Tue 07/16 9:28 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Barhane Sengal Eman, Sheqa Transportation, LLC (Vanderver, Clint) |
|
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 07/16 9:08 PM
Joint ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Barhane Sengal Eman, Sheqa Transportation, LLC.(Vanderver, Clint) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY
Tue 07/09 10:43 PM
NOTICE Supplement to Notice of Removal by Barhane Sengal Eman, Sheqa Transportation, LLC re1 Notice of Removal,,,(Vanderver, Clint) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit D - Declaration of Wegihu Tesfamariam, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit E - Declaration of Barhane Sengal Eman | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 07/09 3:54 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Barhane Sengal Eman, Sheqa Transportation, LLC from Harrison County Circuit Court - First Judicial District, case number A2401 24-00075 Lower court jury demand. (Filing fee $ 405; receipt number 5446263) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (JCH) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Waiver of Service to Sheqa & Eman, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Entire State Court Record, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |