Griffin et al v. Espinoza Zaragoza et al
New Mexico District Court | |
Judge: | Kirtan Khalsa |
Referred: | John F Robbenhaar |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00700 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.) |
Case Filed: | Jul 09, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Second Judicial District Court, D-202-CV-24-04538 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 6:39 AM MDT |
Defendant
Bennett Truck Transport LLC
YLAW, PC 4908 Alameda Blvd. NE
Albuquerque, NM 87113 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Marco Antonio Espinoza Zaragoza
YLAW, PC 4908 Alameda Blvd. NE
Albuquerque, NM 87113 |
|
Plaintiff
Leonel Allred
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen Griffin
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Bennett Truck Transport LLC, Marco Antonio Espinoza Zaragoza voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Ramos, S) | ||
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
9 | 9 3 pgs INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 10/7/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Counsel will call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at (888) 363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 9/27/2024. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 9/13/2024. (ajp) | |
8 | 8 NOTICE by Marco Antonio Espinoza Zaragoza re1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal (Ramos, S) | |
7 | 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Marco Antonio Espinoza Zaragoza. (Ramos, S) | |
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel E. Perez on behalf of Leonel Allred, Stephen Griffin (Perez, Daniel) | |
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
5 | 5 Defendant Bennett Truck Transport LLC's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Bennett Truck Transport LLC. (Ramos, S) | |
4 | 4 NOTICE by Bennett Truck Transport LLC Notice of Filing State Court Record (Ramos, S) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Issued Summons - BTT, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Return of Service - BTT | ||
3 | 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc) | |
2 | 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bennett Truck Transport LLC identifying Corporate Parent MGT Management Services, LLC, Corporate Parent MGT Holdings, LLC for Bennett Truck Transport LLC. (Ramos, S) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bennett Truck Transport LLC from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2024-04538. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Bennett Truck Transport LLC.(Ramos, S) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Service Packet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Affidavit of BTT | ||
Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9440497 re1 Notice of Removal, filed by Bennett Truck Transport LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Ramos, S) | ||
United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (bc) | ||
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc) |