Momani v. Kenosha County Sheriff's Department
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | William C Griesbach |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00853 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 09, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 30, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Wed 07/31 12:45 PM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Madison Reese Momani. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (jmk) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
order
Judgment
Tue 07/30 9:26 AM
JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk as approved by Judge William C Griesbach on 7/30/2024. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party) (jmk) |
|
11 | 11
4
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 07/30 9:24 AM
SCREENING ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 7/29/2024 GRANTING2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee filed by Madison Reese Momani. This action is DISMISSED because it is duplicative to Momani v. Kenosha County Sheriffs Dept, Case No. 24-C-799 (E.D. Wis.). The Clerk of Court to enter judgment accordingly. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party to current and future address and officer in charge) (Griesbach, William) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Letter
Thu 07/25 12:07 PM
LETTER from Madison Momani indicating future updated address and request for mail be sent to institution and residence of 1702 24th St Kenosha, WI 53140. (jmk) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Letter
Mon 07/22 12:25 PM
LETTER from Plaintiff indicating he is unable to pay the $5.08 initial partial filing fee. (mac) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Letter
Mon 07/22 12:23 PM
LETTER from Plaintiff requesting to add CO Gonzalez as a defendant.(mac) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Mon 07/22 12:14 PM
(Unsigned) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Madison Reese Momani. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (NOTE: Form re-mailed to Plaintiff on 7/22/2024) (mac) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Letter
Mon 07/22 12:12 PM
LETTER from Plaintiff regarding initial partial filing fee.(mac) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
4
pgs
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Thu 07/11 10:04 AM
ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 7/10/2024. On or before 30 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $5.08 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party and officer in charge) (Griesbach, William) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Letter from Clerk re Consent to Magistrate
Tue 07/09 4:00 PM
LETTER from the Clerk to Madison Reese Momani re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (kwf) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Tue 07/09 3:45 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Madison Reese Momani. (Filed in Case No. 24-C-799) (kwf) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee
Tue 07/09 3:44 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Madison Reese Momani. (kwf) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Prisoner
Tue 07/09 3:43 PM
PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against Kenosha County Sheriff's Department by Madison Reese Momani. (kwf) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope |