Healthcare at College Park, LLC
Georgia Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Robert M Matson |
Case #: | 5:24-bk-51011 |
Case Filed: | Jul 09, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Health Care Business |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Healthcare at College Park, LLC
PO Box 69
Bolingbroke, GA 31004-0069 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee - MAC
440 Martin Luther King Jr. Boulevard Suite 302
Macon, GA 31201 |
Docket last updated: 09/05/2024 12:00 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion Authorizing Continued Use of Existing Bank Accounts
Tue 09/03 8:28 AM
Order Granting Motion Authorizing Continued Use of Existing Bank Accounts . (Baxley, Sandra) |
|
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 08/24 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/23/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
court
Memo Regarding Monthly Report
Wed 08/21 8:25 AM
Memo Regarding Monthly Report to the US Trustee;. DIP Report due by 9/20/2024. (Baxley, Sandra) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 08/09 10:51 AM
Certificate of Service filed by Debtor Healthcare at College Park, LLC (Boyer, Wesley) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 08/09 12:33 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 52. Notice Date 08/08/2024. (Admin.) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury
Thu 08/08 5:26 PM
Schedules A-J, Original without certificate of service to additional creditors or codebtors, Fee Amount $34, Original Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors , Original Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor , Equity Security Holders filed by Debtor Healthcare at College Park, LLC (Boyer, Wesley) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Amended Document/Motion/Application
Thu 08/08 4:05 PM
Amended Document (amending the Corporate Ownership Statement only) filed by Debtor Healthcare at College Park, LLC (Boyer, Wesley) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Thu 08/08 5:28 PM
Receipt of Schedules A-J([LINK 24-51011 RMM] ) [misc,schaj] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A20045868. Fee amount 34.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
order
Employ
Tue 08/06 8:20 AM
Order Granting Application to Employ Boyer Terry LLC . (Baxley, Sandra) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 08/05 5:08 PM
Certificate of Service filed by Debtor Healthcare at College Park, LLC (Boyer, Wesley) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Authorizing Continued Use of Existing Bank Accounts
Mon 08/05 4:15 PM
Motion for Order Authorizing the Continued Use of Existing Bank Accounts filed by Debtor Healthcare at College Park, LLC Objections due by 8/26/2024 plus an additional 3 (three) days if served by mail.Hearing scheduled for 09/25/2024 at 11:00 AM - Macon Courtroom A. (Boyer, Wesley) |
|
Att: 1 Notice | ||
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
5
pgs
motion
Employ
Fri 08/02 1:26 PM
Application to Employ Wesley J. Boyer as Attorney for Debtor filed by Debtor Healthcare at College Park, LLC (Boyer, Wesley) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Affidavit of Wesley J. Boyer | ||
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 07/27 12:33 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 48. Notice Date 07/26/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
order
Extend Deadline to File Schedules
Wed 07/24 3:19 PM
Order Granting Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information . Deadline to file deficient filings extended to 8/8/2024. (Baxley, Sandra) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extend Deadline to File Schedules
Tue 07/23 4:47 PM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information filed by Debtor Healthcare at College Park, LLC (Boyer, Wesley) |
|
Sunday, July 14, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Mon 07/15 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/14/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 07/13 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/12/2024. (Admin.) |
|
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 07/13 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 51. Notice Date 07/12/2024. (Admin.) |
|
7 | 7
order
DIP Duties
Fri 07/12 9:05 AM
Order that the Debtor File Reports and Summaries on a Monthly Basis . DIP Report due by 8/20/2024. (Baxley, Sandra) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
3
pgs
trustee
Appointment of Ombudsman
Thu 07/11 4:40 PM
Appointment of Health Care Ombudsman Melanie S. McNeil filed by U.S. Trustee - MAC (Hardy, Elizabeth) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12
Wed 07/10 3:18 PM
Original Meeting of Creditors . 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/15/2024 at 10:00 AM at U.S. Trustee Teleconference 2. Proofs of Claims due by 11/13/2024. (Baxley, Sandra) |
|
4 | 4
court
Court's Notice of Deficient Filings
Wed 07/10 11:51 AM
Court's Notice Regarding the Following Deficient Filings: Summary of Schedules, Schedules A/B, D, E/F, G, H; Statement of Financial Affairs, Disclosure of Attorney Compensation, List of Equity Security Holders, Application to Employ. Deficient Filings or Request for Hearing due by 7/24/2024. (Baxley, Sandra) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 07/10 11:25 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Elizabeth A. Hardy filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee - MAC (Hardy, Elizabeth) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 07/10 11:23 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Robert G. Fenimore filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee - MAC (Fenimore, Robert) |
|
court
Add Judge
Wed 07/10 8:19 AM
Judge Robert M Matson added to case. (Thiel, J.) |
||
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
15
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) DO NOT DOCKET-FOR CASE OPENING ONLY
Tue 07/09 5:16 PM
|
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Tue 07/09 5:18 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-51011 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A19975972. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |