California Central District Court
Judge:James V Selna
Referred: Karen E Scott
Case #: 8:24-cv-01511
Nature of Suit355 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 09, 2024
Terminated:Sep 05, 2024
Case in other court:Superior Court of California County of Orange, 30-02023-01344960-CU-
Last checked: Sunday Jan 05, 2025 12:39 AM PST
Defendant
Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By
Amir M Nassihi
Shook Hardy And Bacon LLP
contact info
Rodrigo E Salas
Shook Hardy And Bacon LLP
contact info
Melina Manetti
Shook Hardy And Bacon LLP
contact info
Defendant
DOES
Plaintiff
Angela Covarrubias
Represented By
Kevin Y Jacobson
Quill And Arrow LLP
contact info
Roy Enav
Quill And Arrow LLP
contact info
Danja Stocca
Quill And Arrow LLP
contact info
Allen Amarkarian
Apex Consumer Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
21 21 misc Declaration Thu 04/24 6:39 PM
DECLARATION of Andrew Jung Regarding Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Angela Covarrubias. (Jung, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
20 20 1 pgs order Order Thu 03/13 10:20 AM
ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE DISMISSAL19 by Judge James V. Selna.Based on the Declaration of Plaintiff's Counsel, Andrew Jung, and good cause appearing therefore, the request is approved. The deadline to file dismissal and dispositional documents is hereby extended by forty-five (45) days to April 24, 2025. (es)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
19 19 misc Declaration Mon 03/10 9:05 PM
DECLARATION of Andrew C. Jung re Generic Text Only Entry, 17 Regarding Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Angela Covarrubias.(Jung, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Continuance of Dismissal
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Mon 03/10 9:03 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Andrew C. Jung counsel for Plaintiff Angela Covarrubias. Adding Andrew C. Jung as counsel of record for Plaintiff, Angela Covarrubias for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Angela Covarrubias. (Attorney Andrew C. Jung added to party Angela Covarrubias(pty:pla))(Jung, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
17 17 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Tue 12/10 4:24 PM
[IN CHAMBERS] ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: The Court has reviewed plaintiff's declaration16 , filed on December 04, 2024. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that upon good cause being shown an additional 90 days through March 10, 2025, is granted to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (eva)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
16 16 misc Declaration Wed 12/04 8:43 PM
DECLARATION of Danja Stocca re Order Dismissing Case,14 filed by Plaintiff Angela Covarrubias. (Stocca, Danja)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 12/04 8:41 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Danja Stocca counsel for Plaintiff Angela Covarrubias. Adding Danja Stocca as counsel of record for Angela Covarrubias for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Angela Covarrubias. (Attorney Danja Stocca added to party Angela Covarrubias(pty:pla))(Stocca, Danja)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
14 14 order Dismissing Case Thu 09/05 12:36 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT OF CASE by Judge James V. Selna, re Notice of Settlement13 . IT IS ORDERED that this action be and is hereby dismissed in its entirety without prejudice to the right, upon good cause being shown within 90 days, to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. The Court orders all proceedings in the case vacated and taken off calendar. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (es)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
13 13 notice Settlement Wed 09/04 4:49 PM
NOTICE of Settlement Joint Notice of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Angela Covarrubias. (Jacobson, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order Mon 08/05 3:09 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE 30-DAY DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE A MOTION TO REMAND TO SEPTEMBER 8, 202411 by Judge James V. Selna, the Court GRANTS the Parties' request to preclude Defendant from making any argument that Plaintiff waived any basis with which to move to remand such that this Court may consider and remand on any basis regardless of whether or not it relates to subject matter jurisdiction, provided that Plaintiff files their motion to remand on or before September 8, 2024. (es)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
11 11 3 pgs stip Order Fri 08/02 2:50 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Order To Extend the 30-Day Deadline for Plaintiff to File a Motion to Remand to September 8, 2024 filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc..(Nassihi, Amir)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 07/24 4:07 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Roy Enav counsel for Plaintiff Angela Covarrubias. Adding Roy Enav as counsel of record for Plaintiff, Angela Covarrubias for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Angela Covarrubias. (Attorney Roy Enav added to party Angela Covarrubias(pty:pla))(Enav, Roy)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
9 9 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Fri 07/12 3:16 PM
Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 9/16/2024 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 08/30/2024. (rrp)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 07/12 3:13 PM
INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (rrp)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 07/12 1:57 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 07/12 1:56 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 07/12 1:56 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
4 4 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Wed 07/10 2:13 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 served on July 10, 2024. (Manetti, Melina)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 07/10 10:36 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc., identifying Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.. (Manetti, Melina)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 07/10 10:16 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. (Manetti, Melina)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 07/10 10:12 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California County of Orange, case number 30-2023 01344960-CU-BC-WJC Receipt No: ACACDC-37803204 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attorney Melina Manetti added to party Nissan North America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Manetti, Melina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Thu 07/11 4:52 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Nissan North America, Inc. in Orange County Superior Court on 8/22/2023, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Thu 07/11 4:55 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc. on 1/22/2024, attached as Exhibit B. (jtil)
Related: [-]