Nunn v. State of Nevada
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Gloria M Navarro |
Referred: | Elayna J Youchah |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01239 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 09, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/16 5:01 PM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Tyrone Noel Nunn. (DLS) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 07/11 11:57 AM
ORDER. Plaintiff must either pay the $405 filing fee or file a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis on or before August 23, 2024. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court will send Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis for inmate along with the information and instructions for filing the same. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will retain Plaintiffs Complaint ECF No.1 , but will not file it at this time. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 7/10/2024. ( For Distribution by law library. )(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT) |
|
Att: 1 IFP Inmate | ||
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas
Tue 07/09 3:55 PM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. ( For Distribution by law library. ) (DRM) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Receipt Initiating Documents
Tue 07/09 3:52 PM
RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (DRM) |
|
Att: 1 Initiating Documents Submitted |