Chin v. Fhuere et al
Oregon District Court | |
Judge: | Mustafa T Kasubhai |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-01124 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 09, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 08/28 10:27 AM
ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time8 . Waiver of Service is due by 9/27/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 8/28/2024.) (ps3) |
||
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
oth_sup
Declaration
Tue 08/27 10:56 AM
Declaration of Shannon Vincent in Support of Motion to Extend Time (First) . Filed by Corey Fhuere. (Vincent, Shannon) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 08/27 10:53 AM
Motion for Extension of Time (First) . Filed by Corey Fhuere. (Vincent, Shannon) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Appointment of Counsel
Tue 07/30 2:55 PM
ORDER signed on 07/30/2024 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai: Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No.3 ) is DENIED with leave to renew if the case proceeds to trial. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 07/30/2024.) (bd) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Notice of Lawsuit - Request for Waiver
Mon 07/29 4:03 PM
Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons. Notice, Complaint at1 , and Order at5 forwarded to the Oregon Department of Justice via e-mail on 7/29/2024. Waiver of Service is due by 8/28/2024. Signed on 7/29/2024 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 7/29/2023.) (jw) |
|
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed IFP FORM EVENT
Mon 07/29 3:51 PM
ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IFP AND COLLECTING FILING FEE: Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed IFP2 is GRANTED. IT IS ORDERED that ODOC shall collect payments from Plaintiff's trust account according to the formula set forth above and forward those payments to the Clerk of the Court until a total of $350.00 has been collected and forwarded to the Clerk of the Court. The payments shall be clearly identified by the name and number assigned to this action. A copy of this order has been emailed to the Central Trust Unit. Signed on 7/29/2024 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 7/29/2024.) (jw) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
oth_evt
Case Assignment Notice - FORM EVENT
Wed 07/10 6:28 PM
Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 07/10/2024.) (bd) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Appoint Counsel
Tue 07/09 3:59 PM
Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Yeyin Chin. (eo) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Application for Leave to Proceed IFP
Tue 07/09 3:57 PM
Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Yeyin Chin. (eo) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/09 3:56 PM
Complaint. (IFP Submitted) . Filed by Yeyin Chin against All Defendants. (eo) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |