Rambow v. GMAC Mortgage Corporation
New Hampshire District Court | |
Judge: | Landya B Mccafferty |
Referred: | Talesha L Saint-Marc |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00203 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Anti-trust |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 07, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 22, 2024 4:32 AM EDT |
Defendant
GMAC Mortgage Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Julie A. Rambow
238 North Main St
Concord, NH 03301 |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Consolidation Order
Thu 08/08 3:42 PM
CONSOLIDATION ORDER. 24-cv-202-SE-AJ, 24-cv-203-LM-TSM, and 24-cv-204-SM-AJ are consolidated into one case for pretrial purposes as outlined within this order. 24-cv-203-LM-TSM and 24-cv-204-SM-AJ are administratively closed. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.(de) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
respm
Response - not to Motion
Fri 08/02 4:35 PM
RESPONSE/Objection re3 Order filed by Julie A. Rambow. (de) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
3
pgs
order
Order
Fri 07/26 10:39 AM
ORDER. Unless any party objects in writing within fourteen days of the date of this Order, the clerk's office will consolidate the three cases identified in the caption of this Order into the oldest open case filed by the plaintiff, Rambow v. Harmon, No. 24-cv-202-SE-AJ (D.N.H.). This court takes its preliminary review of the complaints in the cases at issue under advisement, pending either a timely, written objection to this Order, or the consolidation of the cases. This Order must be docketed in all three cases. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.(de) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs
Fri 07/12 12:59 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. Text of Order: Plaintiff's request to proceed without prepayment of fees or costs is hereby granted, but only for the purpose of waiving the filing fee. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Talesha L. Saint-Marc. (mc) |
||
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice - ECF
Tue 07/09 1:34 PM
NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] . (mc) |
||
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs
Tue 07/09 1:32 PM
MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs filed by Julie A. Rambow.(mc) |
|
1 | 1
2
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/09 1:29 PM
COMPLAINT against GMAC Mortgage Corporation with Jury Demand filed by Julie A. Rambow. (mc) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned
Tue 07/09 1:33 PM
Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty and US Magistrate Judge Talesha L. Saint-Marc. The case designation is: 1:24-cv-203-LM-TSM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc) |