Valle et al v. 360 Main Street Associates, LLC et al
Connecticut District Court | |
Judge: | Sarala V Nagala |
Referred: | S Dave Vatti |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-01173 |
Nature of Suit | 230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 22, 2024 4:25 AM EDT |
Defendant
360 Main Street Associates, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Robert W. Chesson
|
|
Defendant
Chesson & Schweickert, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Kristen Klopp
|
|
Defendant
Jeff M. Mastrianni
|
|
Defendant
Kelli McEachern
|
|
Defendant
G. Adam Schweickert
|
|
Defendant
Trio Properties, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Brunilda Ramos-Ayala
|
|
Plaintiff
Nelson Valle
80 State House Square #125
Hartford, CT 06123 |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Fri 07/26 3:49 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *360 Main Street Associates, LLC, Robert W. Chesson, Chesson & Schweickert, LLC, Kristen Klopp, Jeff M. Mastrianni, Kelli McEachern, G. Adam Schweickert, Trio Properties, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Nelson Valle* *80 State House Square #125* *Hartford, CT 06123*. (Gaskins, A) |
|
service
Request to Issue Summons
Fri 07/26 3:47 PM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to 360 Main Street Associates, LLC, Robert W. Chesson, Chesson & Schweickert, LLC, Kristen Klopp, Jeff M. Mastrianni, Kelli McEachern, G. Adam Schweickert, Trio Properties, LLC. (Gaskins, A) |
||
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order
Thu 07/11 6:09 PM
ORDER. The Court has received Plaintiffs' filing fee for this action. Accordingly, Plaintiffs may proceed to service of the complaint. The Court reminds Plaintiffs that it is their responsibility to serve a summons and the operative complaint on Defendants, or request that Defendants waive service, and to file either proof of service or an executed waiver of service with the Court. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m), Defendants must be served or waive service by October 7, 2024 . If Plaintiffs fail to file a proof of service showing that Defendants were served or have waived service by October 7, 2024, this action will be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 4(m). Plaintiffs are directed to review the District Court's Guide for Self-Represented Litigants, available at https://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/guide-self-represented-litigants , which provides guidance regarding service and other matters. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 7/11/2024.(Piccolo, M) |
|
7 | 7
order
Electronic Service Documents
Thu 07/11 2:48 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of4 Electronic Filing Order, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,5 Standing Protective Order,3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,1 Complaint, filed by Nelson Valle,6 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Signed by Clerk on 7/11/2024. (Mendez, D) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Tue 07/09 4:31 PM
Filing fee received from Nelson Valle: $ 405.00, receipt number 21521 (Peterson, M) |
||
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)
Thu 07/11 2:38 PM
Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Mendez, D) |
|
5 | 5
order
Standing Protective Order (Intake)
Thu 07/11 2:30 PM
Standing Protective Order. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 7/8/2024. (Mendez, D) |
|
4 | 4
order
Electronic Filing Order
Thu 07/11 2:28 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 7/8/2024. (Mendez, D) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order on Pretrial Deadlines
Thu 07/11 2:27 PM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/6/2024. Discovery due by 1/7/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 2/11/2025. Signed by Clerk on 7/8/2024. (Mendez, D) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice re: Disclosure Statement
Tue 07/09 4:33 PM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 7/8/2024. (Peterson, M) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/09 4:27 PM
COMPLAINT against 360 Main Street Associates, LLC, Robert W. Chesson, Chesson & Schweickert, LLC, Kristen Klopp, Jeff M. Mastrianni, Kelli McEachern, G. Adam Schweickert, Trio Properties, LLC, filed by Nelson Valle. (Peterson, M) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 07/10 8:30 AM
Judge Sarala V. Nagala and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Shafer, J.) |