Folk v. Associates Asset Recovery, LLC et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Amy Totenberg |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-03018 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:216(b) Labor - Minimum wage or overtime compensation |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 22, 2024 5:00 AM EDT |
Defendant
Associates Asset Recovery, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tammy Reason
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Meaco Folk
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 09/04 3:20 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Meaco Folk. (Fitzpatrick, Kevin) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Leave of Absence
Wed 09/04 11:20 AM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 9/23/24-10/2/24, by Roger S. Sumrall. (Sumrall, Roger) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/22 1:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Diamond Brown on behalf of Associates Asset Recovery, LLC, Tammy Reason (Brown, Diamond) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss
Wed 08/21 8:34 PM
MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Associates Asset Recovery, LLC, Tammy Reason. (Sumrall, Roger) |
|
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 08/21 8:33 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by Associates Asset Recovery, LLC, Tammy Reason. Discovery ends on 1/21/2025.(Sumrall, Roger) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Leave of Absence
Wed 08/21 10:46 AM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): October 21, 2024 - November 1, 2024, by Kevin D. Fitzpatrick, Jr. (Fitzpatrick, Kevin) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint
Thu 08/08 7:59 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, through August 21, 2024 by Associates Asset Recovery, LLC, Tammy Reason. (Sumrall, Roger) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 08/08 11:50 AM
ORDER by docket entry only, GRANTING9 Consent Motion to Extend Time to for Defendant to Object and Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The Defendants shall have through and including 8/21/2024, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Ordered by Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/8/2024. (kng) |
||
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/07 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Roger S. Sumrall on behalf of Associates Asset Recovery, LLC, Tammy Reason (Sumrall, Roger) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Return of Service Executed
Tue 07/23 12:16 PM
Return of Service Executed by Meaco Folk. Tammy Reason served on 7/17/2024, answer due 8/7/2024. (Bridgers, Charles) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 07/12 4:53 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Meaco Folk. (Fitzpatrick, Kevin) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Thu 07/11 10:34 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Associates Asset Recovery, LLC, Tammy Reason.(tmf) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Reason | ||
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Proposed Summons
Wed 07/10 11:45 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Meaco Folk (Corrected)(Bridgers, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
utility
Docket Correction
Wed 07/10 11:59 AM
Notification of Docket Correction re2 Electronic Summons Issued. Document filed in incorrect case. Corrected document at entry4 Electronic Summons Issued. (ane) |
||
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Wed 07/10 11:47 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Associates Asset Recovery, LLC, Tammy Reason.(ane) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Tue 07/09 10:37 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Associates Asset Recovery, LLC, Tammy Reason.(ajw) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/09 10:36 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13556517) filed by Meaco Folk.(ajw) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Meaco Folk's Consent to Serve as a Plaintiff Representative, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |