Herbert v. Credit One Bank
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Victoria M Calvert |
Referred: | Linda T Walker |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-03029 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 22, 2024 5:01 AM EDT |
Defendant
Credit One Bank
|
|
Plaintiff
Cedric Alan Herbert
207 Charity Dr.
Douglasville, GA 30134 |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
utility
Submission to District Judge
Thu 08/22 2:46 PM
Submission of3 Report and Recommendation, to District Judge Victoria M. Calvert. (tcc) |
||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order for Service of Report and Recommendation
Thu 07/18 11:13 PM
ORDER for Service of3 Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 7/18/2024. (jbu) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Report and Recommendation Order ruling on IFP
Thu 07/18 11:12 PM
ORDER AND NON-FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis1 is GRANTED. However, the Complaint as currently pled is deficient. The undersigned RECOMMENDS that Plaintiff be given fourteen (14) days from the date of the district judge's ruling on this Report and Recommendation to file an amended complaint correcting the deficiencies identified above. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 7/18/2024. (jbu) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/18 11:09 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Cedric Alan Herbert.(jbu) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Thu 07/18 11:13 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Cedric Alan Herbert re3 Report and Recommendation,4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation,. (jbu) |
||
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/09 10:23 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cedric Alan Herbert.(ajw) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Tue 07/09 10:26 AM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (ajw) |