Manney v. Owens
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Victoria M Calvert |
Referred: | J Elizabeth Mcbath |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-03033 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Letter
Wed 08/14 10:33 AM
Letter Request for Copies from Henry M. Manney (jbu) |
|
4 | 4
respoth
Objections to Report and Recommendation
Wed 08/14 10:31 AM
OBJECTIONS to2 Report and Recommendation filed by Henry M. Manney. (jbu) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order for Service of Report and Recommendation
Wed 07/24 2:39 PM
ORDER for Service of2 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 7/24/2024. (jbu) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Report and Recommendation - Final
Wed 07/24 2:38 PM
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The undersigned RECOMMENDS that (1) the petition1 be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases, and (2) a certificate of appealability be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 7/24/2024. (jbu) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Wed 07/24 2:40 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Henry M. Manney re2 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, filed by Henry M. Manney,3 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation,. (jbu) |
||
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Tue 07/09 1:01 PM
Submission of1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus to Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath. (nmb) |
||
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Tue 07/09 11:38 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Henry M. Manney. ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 10012724.)(nmb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified file date on 7/9/2024 (nmb) |
|
Att: 1 Brief in Support of Petition, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit List, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 11 Receipt, | ||
Att: 12 Civil Cover Sheet |