Bianco v. Powell et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Referred: | Paige J Gossett |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-03866 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983pr (Other) |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 19, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Document Mailed
Mon 08/19 10:48 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED16 Judgment,15 Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation, placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Bradley Aaron Bianco 2740 Dawson Dr. Chester, SC 29706. (apsn) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Judgment
Mon 08/19 10:45 AM
JUDGMENT: Dismissed without prejudice. (apsn) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
3
pgs
order
Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation
Fri 08/16 10:43 AM
ORDER AND OPINION RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The R&R is ADOPTED as the Order of the Court. (Dkt. No. 11). Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice and without issuance and service of process. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 8/16/24. (ltap, ) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendation
Thu 08/01 2:03 PM
OBJECTION to11 Report and Recommendation by Bradley Aaron Bianco. Reply to Objections due by 8/15/2024 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.(apsn) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Document Mailed
Mon 07/22 7:38 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED9 Order to Notify of Address Change, 10 Clerk's Notice,11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Bradley Aaron Bianco 2740 Dawson Dr. Chester, SC 29706. (apsn) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Report and Recommendation
Mon 07/22 7:37 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending 1 Complaint filed by Bradley Aaron Bianco be dismissed without prejudice and without issuance and service of process. Objections to R&R due by 8/5/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 07/19/2024. (apsn, ) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 07/22 7:34 AM
Clerk's Notice:2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis addressed in9 Order. (apsn) |
|
9 | 9
3
pgs
order
Order to Notify of Address Change
Mon 07/22 7:33 AM
ORDER directing plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any address changes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 07/19/2024. (apsn) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
True Division for Trial
Tue 07/09 10:28 AM
TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Rock Hill. (apsn) |
|
4 | 4
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Tue 07/09 10:22 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Bradley Aaron Bianco.(apsn) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/09 10:20 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bradley Aaron Bianco. Response to Motion due by 7/22/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Motions referred to Paige J. Gossett.(apsn) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/09 10:19 AM
COMPLAINT against Angela Boyd, David Ford, Claude W. Powell, filed by Bradley Aaron Bianco.(apsn) |
|
Att: 1 Declaratory Judgment and Writ of Mandamus, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope 1, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope 2 |