Mack v. Beasley et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Cameron Mcgowan Currie |
Referred: | Shiva V Hodges |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-03870 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983pr (Other) |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Document Mailed
Fri 08/23 9:55 AM
***DOCUMENTS MAILED: 6 Text Order,9 Order and Notice,8 Proper Form Order, one Summons, six USM-285 Forms, one standard Complaint form, placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Brian C. Mack 53048 Lexington County Detention Center 2-A-4 521 Gibson Rd. P.O. Box 2019 Lexington, SC 29071. (cpri) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
13
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 08/23 8:13 AM
ORDER AND NOTICE: Although it appears all of Plaintiff's claims are subject to summary dismissal, the undersigned is issuing this order out of an abundance of caution to permit him to clarify issues that appear ambiguous from the face of the complaint. He may attempt to correct the defects in his complaint by filing an amended complaint by September 12, 2024, along with any appropriate service documents. He is reminded an amended complaint replaces the original complaint and should be complete in itself. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint or fails to cure the deficiencies identified above, the undersigned will recommend to the district court that the claims specified above be dismissed without leave for further amendment. ( Specific Document due by 9/12/2024.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 08/22/2024. (cpri) |
|
8 | 8
order
Proper Form Order
Fri 08/23 8:09 AM
PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 9/12/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 08/22/2024. (cpri) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 08/23 8:02 AM
TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff applied to proceed in the District Court without prepaying fees or costs. ECF No. 2 . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915, the court construes this application as a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915. A review of the motion reveals that Plaintiff should be relieved of the obligation to prepay the full filing fee. Therefore, Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted, subject to the court's right to require a payment if Plaintiff's financial condition changes, and to tax fees and costs against Plaintiff at the conclusion of this case if the court finds the case to be without merit. See Flint v. Haynes, 651 F.2d 970, 972-74 (4th Cir. 1981). Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 08/22/2024. (cpri) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
True Division for Trial
Tue 07/09 9:12 AM
TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Columbia. (cpri) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/09 9:09 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brian C. Mack. Response to Motion due by 7/22/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.. Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges.(cpri) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/09 9:05 AM
COMPLAINT against David Beasley, Facility/Hospital, Mental Health, Mental Health Hospital, Michael Moore, South Carolina Department of Corrections, South Carolina State Park Aging and Health, Tamachio, Third Party / Private Sector for Pre-Medical Services, filed by Brian C. Mack.. (cpri) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |