Lester v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Bristow Marchant |
Referred: | Bristow Marchant |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-03861 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer/Electronic Certified Administrative Record
Mon 09/09 4:42 PM
ANSWER/ELECTRONIC CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.Plaintiffs Brief due by 10/9/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.(Leach, David) |
|
Att: 1 Part 2 of 25, | ||
Att: 2 Part 3 of 25, | ||
Att: 3 Part 4 of 25, | ||
Att: 4 Part 5 of 25, | ||
Att: 5 Part 6 of 25, | ||
Att: 6 Part 7 of 25, | ||
Att: 7 Part 8 of 25, | ||
Att: 8 Part 9 of 25, | ||
Att: 9 Part 10 of 25, | ||
Att: 10 Part 11 of 25, | ||
Att: 11 Part 12 of 25, | ||
Att: 12 Part 13 of 25, | ||
Att: 13 Part 14 of 25, | ||
Att: 14 Part 15 of 25, | ||
Att: 15 Part 16 of 25, | ||
Att: 16 Part 17 of 25, | ||
Att: 17 Part 18 of 25, | ||
Att: 18 Part 19 of 25, | ||
Att: 19 Part 20 of 25, | ||
Att: 20 Part 21 of 25, | ||
Att: 21 Part 22 of 25, | ||
Att: 22 Part 23 of 25, | ||
Att: 23 Part 24 of 25, | ||
Att: 24 Part 25 of 25 | ||
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Change of Case Number
Thu 07/11 11:33 AM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER: The new case number is 8:24-cv-03861-BM. Please make a note of this for all future filings as well as Judge's filing preferences. (jens) |
|
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Consent
Thu 07/11 11:30 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant Signed by Honorable Jacquelyn D Austin on 7/11/24. (jens) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/10 12:43 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 10 Motion for Jennifer Dunn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 07/10/2024.(jens) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion)
Wed 07/10 11:15 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer Dunn ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-11867829) by Deborah Lester. Response to Motion due by 7/24/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(McChesney, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Memo in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
9 | 9
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Wed 07/10 11:04 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Deborah Lester.. (McChesney, Paul) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/09 4:37 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 3 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 07/09/2024.(jens) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order
Tue 07/09 3:43 PM
TEXT ORDER: Directing the parties' attention to the Court's Standing Order on All 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) Social Security Disability Appeals Assigned to Judge Jacquelyn D Austin, located on the District Court's website. Within 30 days of the date of this Text Order, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to file either a (1) signed and completed Notice, Consent, and Reference of Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, or (2) status report informing the Court that Plaintiff does not consent to disposition of this action by Magistrate Judge.(Status Report due by 08/09/2024.)Entered at the direction of Honorable Jacquelyn D Austin on 07/09/2024.(jens, ) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Set Answer Deadline - Social Security Complaint
Tue 07/09 3:38 PM
Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, notifying the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of the General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the case. No summonses shall issue. Set Answer Deadline - Social Security Complaint: Answer due from Commissioner of Social Security Administration on 9/9/2024 (jens) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/09 3:35 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Deborah Lester. Response to Motion due by 7/22/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(jens) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Social Security Cases Only
Tue 07/09 3:31 PM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.03 regarding Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website., filed by Deborah Lester.(jens) |