Nofflett v. FCI Beckley
West Virginia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Frank W Volk |
Referred: | Omar J Aboulhosn |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00340 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 24, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal - Rule 41
Wed 07/24 12:15 PM
LETTER FORM NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Joseph Nofflett pursuant to Rule 41, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (msa) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
6
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 07/11 10:26 AM
ORDER directing that Plaintiff shall either pay the filing and administrative fee totaling $405 or file an Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by 8/12/2024; Plaintiff has until 8/12/2024 to amend his1 Complaint to specifically set forth his constitutional claims and state specific facts as to how each defendant violated his constitutional rights. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 7/11/2024. (cc: Plaintiff - pro se with form Complaint and blank Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis) (btm) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Mag. Judge Aboulhosn - Standing Order For Assignment And Referral of Civil Actions And Matters
Tue 07/09 2:55 PM
STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: counsel of record and any pro se party) (msa) |
|
utility
Case Assigned
Wed 07/10 8:46 AM
CASE assigned to Judge Frank W. Volk. (klc) |
||
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
5
pgs
respm
Memorandum In Support
Tue 07/09 2:50 PM
AFFIDAVIT by Joseph Nofflett in support of1 Letter-Form Complaint. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (msa) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/09 2:19 PM
LETTER-FORM COMPLAINT. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (msa) (Modified on 7/9/2024 to correct filed date) (msa) |