Boyd v. United States of America
Tennessee Western District Court | |
Judge: | Sheryl H Lipman |
Referred: | Annie T Christoff |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-02482 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 08/23 9:53 AM
ORDER DIRECTING UNITED STATES TO RESPOND. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 08/23/2024. (shl) |
|
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss
Fri 08/16 10:18 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by Marcus Boyd.(jae) |
|
Att: 1 envelope | ||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Thu 07/25 4:54 PM
ORDER DENYING5 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on July 25, 2024. (shl) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Appoint Counsel
Fri 07/19 10:40 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Marcus Boyd.(jae) |
|
Att: 1 envelope | ||
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/10 11:08 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Naya Bedini on behalf of United States of America (Bedini, Naya) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice LR 16.2
Tue 07/09 10:32 AM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Pro Se Complaint
Tue 07/09 10:32 AM
PRO SE Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence Pursuant to 28 USC § 2255 against United States of America, filed by Marcus Boyd.(jae) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 envelope | ||
1 | 1
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 07/09 10:29 AM
Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (jae) |