Katsnelson v. Evolve Bank & Trust Corporation
Tennessee Western District Court | |
Judge: | Sheryl H Lipman |
Referred: | Tu M Pham |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-02487 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 4:56 AM CDT |
Defendant
Evolve Bank & Trust Corporation
6000 Poplar Ave
Memphis, TN 38119 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ian Katsnelson, NY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Marcantel
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 08/26 2:53 PM
ORDER DELAYING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE UNTIL RULING FROM THE JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION ON PENDING MOTION FOR TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 1407. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 8/26/2024. (shl) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/20 7:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amisha R Patel on behalf of Evolve Bank & Trust Corporation (Patel, Amisha) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 08/06 4:07 PM
ORDER GRANTING14 DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 8/6/2024. (shl) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 08/05 4:26 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint (Proposed Order Submitted) by Evolve Bank & Trust Corporation. (Schrack, Andrew) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 08/05 4:25 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Evolve Bank & Trust Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Evolve Bancorp, inc. for Evolve Bank & Trust Corporation.. (Schrack, Andrew) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/05 4:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew B Schrack on behalf of Evolve Bank & Trust Corporation (Schrack, Andrew) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/05 4:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel W. Van Horn on behalf of Evolve Bank & Trust Corporation (Van Horn, Daniel) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 07/29 3:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica Marcantel, Ian Katsnelson as to Evolve Bank & Trust Corporation. (Stranch, J.) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 07/11 1:50 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jessica Marcantel. (Stranch, J.) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 07/11 1:48 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ian Katsnelson. (Stranch, J.) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/11 1:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Grayson Wells on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wells, Robert) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/11 8:04 AM
Summons Issued as to Evolve Bank & Trust Corporation. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge
Thu 07/11 8:04 AM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice LR 16.2
Thu 07/11 8:03 AM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) |
|
3 | 3
notice
ADR Compliance
Thu 07/11 8:03 AM
NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 07/11 8:00 AM
Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae) |
|
1 | 1
38
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/09 6:39 PM
COMPLAINT against Evolve Bank & Trust Corporation (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNWDC-4453663), filed by IAN KATSNELSON.(Stranch, J.) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |