Miner v. Gunther
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | James A Teilborg |
Referred: | James F Metcalf |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01662 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal) |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Wed 08/28 9:48 AM
Summons Issued as to Jason Gunther, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General.(DXD) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 08/28 9:47 AM
ORDER - The Clerk must serve a copy of the Summons, the Petition (Doc.1 ) and this Order upon the United States Attorney for the District of Arizona, the United States Attorney General, and Respondent by certified mail. Respondent Warden Jason Gunther must answer the Petition within 20 days of the date of service. Petitioner may file a reply within 30 days from the date of service of the answer. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge James F. Metcalf pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 8/27/24. (DXD) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
5
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 07/17 4:06 PM
ORDER - Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Petitioner must either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk shall enter judgment of dismissal without prejudice and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot if Petitioner fails to comply. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 7/17/24. (DXD) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Filing Fee Received
Tue 07/16 7:07 AM
Filing fee PAID IN FULL. (BAS) Modified on 7/16/2024 to correct file date (BAS) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Assignment
Tue 07/09 12:46 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (DXD) |
|
Att: 1 Instructions | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241)
Tue 07/09 12:45 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) filed by Ronald L Miner (12 pages).(DXD) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |