Martin v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Diane J Humetewa |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-08133 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss Case
Thu 09/05 12:31 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Gonzalez de Llano, Oscar) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF CHRISTIANNE VOEGELE | ||
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Brief - Opening
Tue 08/13 11:07 AM
OPENING BRIEF by Tambi Leigh Martin.(EJA) |
|
Att: 1 part 2, | ||
Att: 2 part 3 | ||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
Tue 07/23 5:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Oscar Gonzalez de Llano on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Gonzalez de Llano, Oscar) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice - SS Action Commenced
Tue 07/09 3:58 PM
NOTICE: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Case Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, notifying the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the case. No summons shall issue. (Notice mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff via US Mail). This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (EJA) |
|
6 | 6
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 07/09 3:57 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: See document for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/9/24. (EJA) |
|
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/09 3:56 PM
ORDER granting2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/9/24. (EJA) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Notice to Self-Represented Litigant
Tue 07/09 12:42 PM
NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (EJA) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
New Case Opened
Tue 07/09 12:39 PM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 24-08133 PCT-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (EJA) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/09 12:35 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Tambi Leigh Martin. (EJA) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/09 12:34 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Tambi Leigh Martin.(EJA) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |