Smith v. Gutierrez et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer G Zipps |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00329 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Tue 09/03 8:04 AM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Joseph H Smith. (3 pages) (MCO) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 09/03 8:02 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Joseph H Smith. (2 pages) (MCO) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
6
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Fri 08/02 10:17 AM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc.2 ) is denied without prejudice. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $55.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement (or institutional equivalent). If Plaintiff fails to either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $55.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Non-Habeas). Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 8/1/2024. (See attached Order for complete information.)(SCA) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Assignment
Tue 07/09 12:53 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (SCA) |
|
Att: 1 Instructions | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/09 12:51 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Joseph H Smith. (2 pages) (SCA) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/09 12:49 PM
PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Joseph H Smith. (262 pages) (SCA) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit | ||
Att: 5 Envelope |