Aidong Zou v. Baizhonghui Co. Ltd, et al
Original Case: 1:23-cv-16600
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02169 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Case Filed: | Jul 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 10, 2024 3:29 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellant
BAIZHONGHUI CO. LTD
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
GOLDEN GLORY STAND
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
ULTIMATE LIGHTS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
AIDONG ZOU
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/10/2024 3:25 AM CDT |
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet filed. Appellant's' brief due on or before 08/19/2024 for Baizhonghui Co. Ltd, Golden Glory Stand and Ultimate Lights. [1] [7392367] 24-2169 (CG) [Entered: 07/09/2024 11:40 AM] | |
Att: 1 22 pgs Civil Case | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court | ||
2 | 2 1 pgs ORDER: A preliminary review of the short record indicates that on June 11, 2024, the district court granted an injunction against the appellants but has not complied with Rule 65(d)(1)(C) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, which requires an order granting an injunction to ?describe in reasonable detail?and not by referring to the complaint or other document?the act or acts restrained or required,? and preferably to do so in a document separate from the court?s opinion. See MillerCoors LLC v. Anheuser-Busch Companies, LLC, 940 F.3d 922, 923 (7th Cir. 2019). Accordingly, both appellants and appellee shall file, on or before July 23, 2024, a statement advising the court whether they will request in the district court that the terms of the injunction be set out in a separate document. JXK [2] [7392454] 24-2169 (HTP) [Entered: 07/09/2024 02:59 PM] |