Jones v. USA
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Sean D Jordan |
Referred: | Kimberly C Priest Johnson |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00632 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal) |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
service
Acknowledgment of Receipt
Tue 07/30 3:50 PM
Case transferred from Texas Eastern has been opened in SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS as case 4:24-cv-02816, filed 07/30/2024. (rpc) |
||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 07/16 4:32 PM
ORDER OF TRANSFER. It is ORDERED that the petition is TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division. 28 U.S.C. § 2241(d). The Clerk of Court shall transfer the case forthwith and without delay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 7/16/2024. (rpc) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Transfer
Tue 07/16 4:34 PM
Interdistrict transfer to the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division. (rpc) |
||
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 07/10 10:20 AM
Case Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan and Referred to Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (rpc) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Referral | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Wed 07/10 10:12 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5.00 Paid), filed by Nnenna Mary Jones.(rpc) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Additional Attachment(s) | ||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability
Wed 07/10 10:22 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . **Consent form mailed to petitioner. (rpc) |
||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Wed 07/10 3:38 PM
Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 01409 (rpc) |