Wilson v. Management & Training Corporation - M.T.C. et al
Mississippi Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Tom S Lee |
Referred: | Andrew S Harris |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00396 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Letter
Wed 07/31 11:02 AM
Letter from Anthony Deundra Wilson. (LAT) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
5 | 5
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 07/31 10:44 AM
MOTION for a Fast and Speedy Public Trial by Anthony Deundra Wilson.(LAT) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
4 | 4
service
Acknowledgment of Receipt and Cert. (PSP3)
Wed 07/31 10:43 AM
Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to3 Order Opsp2, Acknowledgement filed by Anthony Deundra Wilson.(LAT) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
6
pgs
order
Order Opsp2
Tue 07/23 2:10 PM
ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 8/22/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew S. Harris on 7/23/2024 (PG) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed IFP 1983
Wed 07/10 1:26 PM
*RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Anthony Deundra Wilson.(PG) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/10 1:23 PM
COMPLAINT against East Mississippi Correctional Facility Administration, Management & Training Corporation - M.T.C., Unknown Singleton, Unknown Williams, filed by Anthony Deundra Wilson.(PG) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Assignment, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope |