Jeffrey Ledford v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03895 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 7:06 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
DuPont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Ledford
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 07/10 1:56 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 07/10/2024), Jeffrey Ledford v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-03895-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Northern Georgia (mbon) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/10 1:55 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mbon) |
|
1 | 1
38
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/10 1:54 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11868325.), filed by Jeffrey Ledford. Service due by 10/8/2024 (mbon) |