Hall v. Rouse et al
Tennessee Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Charles E Atchley, Jr |
Referred: | Susan K Lee |
Case #: | 1:24-mc-00030 |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 01, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
In Forma Pauperis (Proceed)
Fri 08/09 3:01 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (no certificate of inmate account attached) by Daniel Richard Hall, III.(BJL) |
|
Att: 1 Hall letter, | ||
Att: 2 Hall's Envelope, | ||
Att: 3 Letter and Envelope from Hamilton County Criminal Court | ||
misc
Public Docket Annotation
Fri 08/09 3:14 PM
1:24-mc-00030-CEA-SKL Hall v. Rouse et al is now opened as Civil Case 1:24-cv-00271-CEA- SKL pursuant to5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (no certificate of inmate account attached) by Daniel Richard Hall, III. (BJL) |
||
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Supplement
Fri 07/12 1:34 PM
SUPPLEMENT to1 Complaint by Daniel Richard Hall, III. (JCK) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice re Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address
Wed 07/10 2:28 PM
Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (DCB) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Deficiency (IFP)
Wed 07/10 1:57 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency (IFP) - The Court is in receipt of your complaint/petition. However, in order for this matter to proceed, you must either pay the required filing fee or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis. (DCB) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/10 1:55 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Daniel Richard Hall, III.(DCB) |