Kennedy v. Flowers Baking Company of Bardstown, LLC et al
West Virginia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas E Johnston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00342 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 29, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Circuit Court of Mingo County, 24-C-59 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 5:30 AM EDT |
Defendant
Flowers Baking Company of Bardstown, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ABM General Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Zachary Kennedy
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 08/29 3:12 PM
ORDER pursuant to the parties'19 Stipulation of Dismissal; DISMISSING this civil action WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 8/29/2024. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation Of Dismissal
Wed 08/28 2:24 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Without Prejudice by ABM General Services, Inc., Flowers Baking Company of Bardstown, LLC, Zachary Kennedy. (Tully, Jared) (Modified on 8/28/2024 to add party filer) (kew) |
|
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 08/23 3:53 PM
ORDER continuing the scheduling conference currently scheduled for 9/4/2024 to 9/6/2024 at 10:00 AM; directing that the scheduling conference shall be held telephonically. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 8/23/2024. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (skm) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Rule 26(f) Report Of Planning Meeting
Wed 08/21 4:27 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by ABM General Services, Inc., Flowers Baking Company of Bardstown, LLC. (Tully, Jared) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Response In Opposition
Wed 08/14 1:14 PM
RESPONSE by ABM General Services, Inc., Flowers Baking Company of Bardstown, LLC in opposition to11 MOTION by Zachary Kennedy to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Mingo County (Tully, Jared) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice Of Appearance
Tue 08/13 10:44 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Blake N. Humphrey on behalf of ABM General Services, Inc., Flowers Baking Company of Bardstown, LLC. (Humphrey, Blake) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Affidavit
Wed 07/31 4:24 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Stephanie B Tillman, dated July 8, 2024, filed on behalf of ABM General Services, Inc., Flowers Baking Company of Bardstown, LLC re:1 Notice of Removal,, (Tully, Jared) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Affidavit
Wed 07/31 4:22 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Ashley D Allison, dated July 31, 2024, filed on behalf of ABM General Services, Inc., Flowers Baking Company of Bardstown, LLC re:1 Notice of Removal,, (Tully, Jared) |
|
12 | 12
10
pgs
respm
Memorandum In Support
Wed 07/31 10:48 AM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Zachary Kennedy in support of11 MOTION by Zachary Kennedy to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Mingo County. (Brown, Nathan) (Modified on 7/31/2024 to remove link to #1 notice of removal) (kew) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Remand To Circuit Court
Wed 07/31 10:46 AM
MOTION by Zachary Kennedy to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Mingo County (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Brown, Nathan) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
order
Clerk's Order Reassigning Case
Wed 07/17 8:33 AM
CLERK'S ORDER. For reasons appearing to the court, this action is reassigned from Judge Joseph R. Goodwin to Judge Thomas E. Johnston. Signed by Clerk of Court Rory L. Perry II on 7/17/2024. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (klc) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Rule 7.1, FRCivP
Thu 07/11 4:37 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Flowers Baking Company of Bardstown, LLC. (Tully, Jared) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Rule 7.1, FRCivP
Thu 07/11 4:37 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant ABM General Services, Inc. (Tully, Jared) |
|
7 | 7
order
Judge Goodwin's Order and Notice
Thu 07/11 11:16 AM
ORDER AND NOTICE: Motions under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) - 8/1/2024. Last day for Rule 26(f) meeting - 8/14/2024. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) meeting - 8/21/2024. Scheduling Conference at 9:00 AM on 9/4/2024 at the Robert C. Byrd United States Courthouse, 300 Virginia Street East, Room 6610 (Library/Conference Room), Charleston, WV. Entry of scheduling order - 9/11/2024. Last day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures - 9/18/2024. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/11/2024. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (mfo) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice Of Failure to File Disclosure Statement
Thu 07/11 10:56 AM
NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 as to ABM General Services, Inc., Flowers Baking Company of Bardstown, LLC. (mkw) |
|
5 | 5
order
Mag. Judge Tinsley - Standing Order For Assignment And Referral of Civil Actions And Matters
Thu 07/11 8:58 AM
STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: counsel of record and any pro se party) (klc) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer To Complaint
Wed 07/10 5:05 PM
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COMPLAINT attached to1 Notice of Removal by Flowers Baking Company of Bardstown, LLC.(Tully, Jared) |
|
3 | 3
answer
Answer To Complaint
Wed 07/10 5:04 PM
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COMPLAINT attached to1 Notice of Removal by ABM General Services, Inc.(Tully, Jared) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice Of Failure to File Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/10 2:36 PM
NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 as to ABM General Services, Inc., Flowers Baking Company of Bardstown, LLC. (lca) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice Of Removal
Wed 07/10 2:34 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ABM General Services, Inc., Flowers Baking Company of Bardstown, LLC with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Mingo County. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-8689514. (lca) |
|
Att: 1 13 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Julianna Portugal, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration of Stephanie Tillman, | ||
Att: 5 Declaration of Allison Nelson, | ||
Att: 6 State Court Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 7 State Court Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Return for Flowers Baking, | ||
Att: 9 Return for ABM Gerneral Services, | ||
Att: 10 State Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 11 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned
Thu 07/11 8:57 AM
CASE assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (klc) |