Taylor v. Oklahoma Tax Commission et al
Oklahoma Western District Court | |
Judge: | David L Russell |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00693 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 16, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Oklahoma County District Court, CJ-24-03791 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 4:23 AM CDT |
Defendant
Oklahoma Tax Commission
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Melody Suess
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Miles Taylor
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 08/16 9:46 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by Miles Taylor. (Hammons, Mark) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 08/12 12:28 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re5 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by Oklahoma Tax Commission, Melody Suess.(Neel, Tracy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - 5 OS Ch 1, App 3-A, Sec Rule 4.2 | ||
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 08/05 4:05 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re5 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by Miles Taylor. (Hammons, Mark) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Jury Demand
Tue 07/23 2:54 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Miles Taylor. (Hammons, Mark) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 07/19 11:17 AM
ORDER granting7 Application to Enlarge Plaintiff's Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall file his response no later than August 12, 2024. Signed by Judge David L. Russell on 07/19/2024. (km) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 07/18 5:21 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to5 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Miles Taylor. (Hammons, Mark) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Entry of Appearance
Thu 07/18 5:19 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Mark E Hammons on behalf of Miles Taylor (Hammons, Mark) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss
Wed 07/17 12:11 PM
MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by All Defendants. (Neel, Tracy) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Entry of Appearance
Mon 07/15 12:04 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Kevin L McClure on behalf of All Defendants (McClure, Kevin) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Entry of Appearance
Mon 07/15 12:02 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Tracy E Neel on behalf of All Defendants (Neel, Tracy) |
|
misc
Payment for a Civil Case
Mon 07/15 11:57 AM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AOKWDC-4474305. (Neel, Tracy) |
||
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 07/12 10:52 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Miles Taylor. Oklahoma Tax Commission served on 7/12/2024. (Hammons, Mark) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 07/10 1:19 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oklahoma County District Court, case number CJ-2024-3791 filed by Melody Suess, Oklahoma Tax Commission.(naa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - OSCN Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - EOA Mark Hammons, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |