Smith, Jr. v. O'Malley
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | William C Griesbach |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00859 |
Nature of Suit | 865 Social Security - RSI (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/05 4:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Judy Tsui on behalf of Martin J O'Malley. Attorney(s) appearing: Judy Tsui (Tsui, Judy) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Mon 07/29 5:38 PM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Keith C. Smith, Jr.. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Marvin, Cody) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
socsec
Briefing Letter
Mon 07/22 12:24 PM
Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to the parties: Defendant to file and serve certified administrative record by 9/20/24 . (cc: all counsel) (lh) |
|
socsec
Notice - Action Commenced
Mon 07/22 12:19 PM
Notice of Service - Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), the Clerk has electronically notified via CM/ECF the Social Security Administration Office of the General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. (lh) |
||
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Thu 07/11 2:51 PM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Martin J O'Malley. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 07/11 11:40 AM
ORDER GRANTING3 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on July 11, 2024. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee
Wed 07/10 1:41 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Keith C. Smith, Jr.. (Marvin, Cody) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/10 1:39 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Keith C. Smith, Jr.. (Marvin, Cody) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Social Security
Wed 07/10 1:36 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Keith C. Smith, Jr.(Marvin, Cody) |
|
Att: 1 AC decision, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Wed 07/10 1:44 PM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available[LINK:here.] (ams) |