United Security Inc. v. Arango et al
Connecticut District Court | |
Judge: | Jeffrey A Meyer |
Referred: | Robert A Richardson |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-01180 |
Nature of Suit | 880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA) |
Cause | 18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 5:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
Fernando Arango
|
|
Defendant
Prosegur Security USA
|
|
Plaintiff
United Security Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order
Wed 09/04 3:48 PM
MEMORANDUM OF CONFERENCE AND ORDER FOR REFERRAL TO JUDGE RICHARDSON FOR CONTINUED SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The Court heard from counsel today that they are in good faith negotiations with respect to an agreement concerning interim remedies. The Court requested that counsel file a status report or the final agreement for the Court's review and approval on or before September 11, 2024 . The Court also advised counsel that it would refer the matter for a further scheduling conference with Magistrate Judge Richardson to be set as his schedule allows. Counsel should contact Judge Richardson's chambers about scheduling. Lastly, the Court advised counsel that if they mutually believe that an overall settlement may be possible rather than litigation of a preliminary injunction, then they may file a notice or request on the docket or advise Judge Meyer's law clerk by telephone, and Judge Meyer would then enter a separate order of referral to another magistrate judge to conduct a settlement conference. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 09/04/2024. (Mejia-Cruz, D.) |
|
25 | 25
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 09/04 3:33 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Telephonic Status Conference held on 9/4/2024. Parties to file a notice within 1 week from today regarding the status of agreement. 07 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Lewis, D) |
|
24 | 24
utility
Calendar Entry
Wed 09/04 11:10 AM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/4/2024 at 03:00 PM in Remote Setting before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer. Parties are instructed to call 877-402-9753; Access Code 8576007#. (Lewis, D) |
|
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 09/04 11:06 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Beth Royal on behalf of Prosegur Security USA and Fernando Arango (Royal, Amy) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order
Wed 08/28 6:17 PM
MEMORANDUM OF CONFERENCE AND ORDER. The Court convened a status teleconference with counsel today. The Court allowed attorney Carlos J. Burruezo to appear on behalf of defendants with the understanding that he is retaining local counsel to appear for any future proceedings and pending any pro hac vice admission. The Court heard from counsel for both sides, and the Court asked counsel to promptly consult directly with one another with a view toward reaching any possible agreement concerning any interim measures or relief pending a hearing on plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction. The Court will convene another telephone status/scheduling conference at 3:00pm on Wednesday, September 4, 2024 . The parties are instructed to call 877-402-9753; Access Code 8576007#. The Court is hopeful that the parties will negotiate a written agreement on any interim relief prior to the next status conference, and the Court will be prepared to approve such an agreement. On the other hand, to the extent that the parties report at the next status conference that they are unable to reach an agreement on interim relief, the Court is likely to set an expedited briefing schedule with respect to any disputed issues. The Court will also discuss future scheduling with counsel at the next status conference and will inquire about the parties' position with respect to referral to a Magistrate Judge for a settlement conference. Counsel for the defendants stated that he would advise his clients of the importance of ensuring that there is no interim violation of the plaintiff's legal rights under the agreements with defendant Arango or otherwise under statutory and common law. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 08/28/2024. (Mejia-Cruz, D.) |
|
21 | 21
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 08/28 4:56 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/28/2024. Attorney Burruezo is allowed to appear for today pending appearance of local counsel; Parties to meet and confer; a further phone conference will be scheduled for early next week with either Judge Meyer or possibly Judge Richardson. 17 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Lewis, D) |
|
20 | 20
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 08/28 10:36 AM
First CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United Security Inc. re18 Notice of Compliance with Pretrial Order for telephone status (Ryan, Claire) |
|
19 | 19
utility
Calendar Entry
Wed 08/28 10:32 AM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 3:00 Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/28/2024 has been change to 03:30 PM in Remote Setting before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer. Parties are instructed to call 877-402-9753; Access Code 8576007#. (Lewis, D) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Compliance with Pretrial Order
Tue 08/27 3:56 PM
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PRETRIAL ORDER by United Security Inc. Order regarding Telephone Status (Ryan, Claire) |
|
17 | 17
utility
Calendar Entry
Tue 08/27 11:05 AM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/28/2024 at 03:00 PM in Remote Setting before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer. Parties are instructed to call 877-402-9753; Access Code 8576007#. (Lewis, D) |
|
16 | 16
order
Order
Tue 08/27 11:02 AM
ORDER RE TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE. Plaintiff United Security Inc. has filed a motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction. Doc. #14 . The Court will conduct a telephone status conference at 3:00pm on August 28, 2024 for the purpose of discussing initial notice and scheduling. Because counsel has not yet filed a notice of appearance in this case for the defendants (but appears to have completed a waiver of service), counsel for plaintiffs shall forthwith advise counsel for defendants of the scheduling of this telephone status conference and shall file on the docket by 5:00pm today a notice of compliance stating that counsel has advised defendants' counsel by telephone and by email of the scheduling of this teleconference. Parties are instructed to call 877-402-9753; Access Code 8576007#. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/27/2024.(Lewis, D) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Mon 08/26 1:48 PM
First Memorandum in Support re14 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order And Preliminary Injunction filed by United Security Inc..(Ryan, Claire) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavits and documents in support of the Memo of Law in support of its application for a temorary restraining Order and Motion for a Preliminary Injunction | ||
14 | 14
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Mon 08/26 1:43 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order And Preliminary Injunction by United Security Inc.. (Ryan, Claire) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Proposed Order
Mon 08/26 1:40 PM
PROPOSED ORDER To Show Cause by United Security Inc.. (Ryan, Claire) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 07/25 2:32 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to United Security Inc. waiver sent on 7/12/2024, answer due 9/10/2024 filed by United Security Inc.. (Ryan, Claire) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Thu 07/11 11:14 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Fernando Arango, Prosegur Security USA* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Claire E Ryan* *Kaufman Borgeest & Ryan LLP* *1010 Washington Blvd., 7th Floor* *Stamford, CT 06901*. (Chartier, A.) |
|
10 | 10
order
Electronic Service Documents
Thu 07/11 11:10 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of1 Complaint filed by United Security Inc.,9 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction,6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,7 Electronic Filing Order, 4 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,8 Standing Protective Order,3 Notice of Appearance filed by United Security Inc.,5 Disclosure Statement filed by United Security Inc.,2 Notice of Appearance filed by United Security Inc. Signed by Clerk on 7/11/2024.(Chartier, A.) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Disclosure Statement
Thu 07/11 10:09 AM
Disclosure Statement Rule 7.1 by United Security Inc.. (Ryan, Claire) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)
Thu 07/11 11:08 AM
Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Chartier, A.) |
|
8 | 8
order
Standing Protective Order (Intake)
Thu 07/11 11:07 AM
Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/10/2024.(Chartier, A.) |
|
7 | 7
order
Electronic Filing Order
Thu 07/11 11:06 AM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/10/2024.(Chartier, A.) |
|
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Pretrial Deadlines
Thu 07/11 11:05 AM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/8/2024 Discovery due by 1/9/2025 Dispositive Motions due by 2/13/2025 Signed by Clerk on 7/10/2024.(Chartier, A.) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice re: Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/10 5:21 PM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 7/10/24.(Hushin, Z.) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/10 4:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Claire E Ryan on behalf of United Security Inc. (Ryan, Claire) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/10 4:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Dianna D McCarthy on behalf of United Security Inc. (McCarthy, Dianna) |
|
1 | 1
35
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/10 4:39 PM
COMPLAINT against Fernando Arango, Prosegur Security USA ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-7830000.), filed by United Security Inc..(Ryan, Claire) |
|
service
Request to Issue Summons
Wed 07/10 4:40 PM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Fernando Arango, Prosegur Security USA. (Ryan, Claire) |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 07/11 9:41 AM
Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer and Judge Robert A. Richardson added. (Oliver, T.) |