Matasar v. Washoe County Jail et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Anne R Traum |
Referred: | Carla Baldwin |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00302 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/03 1:59 PM
COMPLAINT against Benson, Kelly Dahl, Tonia DellaVella, Detention Center, Frank, Alejandra Gutierrez, Terrence Haugen, Jesska Jackson, Darcie Jury, Monica Magallanes, Angel Mena, Ana Davila Montes, Andrew Munz, Arceli Robles, Carrie Roederer, RiseAnn Scalia, Micheal Tover, Michelle Wagner, Washoe County Jail (Filing fee $405 NOT paid) by Herman Matasar. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 9/13/2024. Proof of service due by 12/2/2024. (GA) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 08/19 7:38 AM
ORDER - Plaintiff has until September 16, 2024, to submit a complaint to this Court. Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff the approved form for filing a 42 U.S.C. § 1983 complaint and instructions. (Attached hereto.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 8/16/2024. ( For Distribution by law library. )(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) |
|
Att: 1 1983 form and instructions | ||
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Receipt Payment
Wed 08/07 11:28 AM
RECEIPT of Payment: $ 405.00, receipt number 3-0635 (DLS) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 07/12 8:54 AM
ORDER - It is therefore ordered that Plaintiff has until August 9, 2024, to submit a complaint to this Court. It is further ordered that Plaintiff has until August 9, 2024, to either pay the full $405 filing fee or file a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis, which is pages 1-3 of the Court's approved form for inmates at NNCC. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send Plaintiff (1) the approved form for filing a 42 U.S.C. § 1983 complaint and instructions for the same and (2) an application to proceed in forma pauperis by an inmate at NNCC and instructions for the same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 7/11/2024. ( For Distribution by law library. )(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint form, | ||
Att: 2 IFP Form | ||
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas
Wed 07/10 2:04 PM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. ( For Distribution by law library. ) (GA) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Receipt Initiating Documents
Wed 07/10 1:59 PM
RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (No Complaint was filed at the time). (GA) |
|
Att: 1 Motion for Injunction |