DO NOT DOCKET IN THIS MEMBER CASE- LEAD CASE IS NOW CIVIL NO. 23-cv-1034 (GMM)
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Gina R Mendez-Miro |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-01313 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 5:56 AM AST |
Defendant
Benworth Capital Partners LLC
700 Biltmore Way Suite C1
Coral Gables, FL 33134 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Benworth Capital Partners PR LLC
954 Ave. Ponce de Len Suite 205 - PMB 10319
Guaynabo, PR 00907 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bernardo Navarro
954 Ponce de Leon Ave. Suite 205 - PMB 10319
San Juan, PR 00907 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Claudia Navarro
954 Ave Ponce de Leon
Suite 205 - PMB 10319, PR 00907 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco
250 AVENIDA MUOZ RIVERA, SUITE 800
SAN JUAN, PR 00918 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM AST |
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order
Wed 08/21 5:57 AM
COPY OF ORDER from LEAD CASE 23-cv-1034: ORDER granting 153 Motion to Consolidate. The Court hereby consolidates Oto Analytics, LLC v. Benworth Capital Partners PR LLC, et al., Civil No. 23-01034 and Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco v. Benworth Capital Partners LLC et al., Civil No. 24-cv-01313. Signed by Judge Gina R. Mendez-Miro on 8/20/2024. (GMN). (mg) |
|
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 08/21 6:05 AM
DO NOT DOCKET IN THIS MEMBER CASE- LEAD CASE IS NOW CIVIL NO. 23-cv-1034 (GMM). (mg) |
||
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Informative Motion
Mon 08/19 9:40 AM
ORDER noting17 Joint Motion Informing Parties' Stipulations Regarding the Defendants; Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Plead to the Complaint (D.E. 1). Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead on or before October 1, 2024. Signed by Judge Gina R. Mendez-Miro on 8/19/2024. (GMN) |
|
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/15 6:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Carla S. Loubriel on behalf of Benworth Capital Partners PR LLC, Claudia Navarro (Loubriel, Carla) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/15 5:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes on behalf of Benworth Capital Partners LLC, Bernardo Navarro (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/15 5:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jaime A. Torrens-Davila on behalf of Benworth Capital Partners LLC, Bernardo Navarro (Torrens-Davila, Jaime) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Informative Motion
Thu 08/15 5:24 PM
Joint INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Parties' Stipulated Deadline for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Plead to the Complaint filed by Monica Del Pilar Ramos-Benitez on behalf of All Defendants. Responses due by 8/29/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Ramos-Benitez, Monica) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Bernardo Navarro Signed Waiver of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Claudia Navarro Signed Waiver of Service | ||
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
order
Memorandum of the Clerk
Fri 08/02 3:06 PM
MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan (Docket No. 15), this case has been transferred to the docket of Judge Gina R. Mendez-Miro, who has consented to said transfer and presides over related case 23-cv-1034-GMM. Signed by Clerk on 08/02/2024. (gr) |
|
15 | 15
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Terminate Motions
Fri 08/02 2:44 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE and granting7 MOTION to transfer case filed by Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco. This case shall be transferred to Judge Gina R. Mendez-Miro, who has consented to said transfer, and who presides over related case no. 23-cv-1034 (GMM). Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 8/2/2024.(mr) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 08/01 9:16 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco upon Benworth Capital Partners PR LLC served on 7/29/2024, answer due 8/19/2024. (Roman-Medina, Anibal) |
|
13 | 13
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 08/01 9:14 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco upon Benworth Capital Partners LLC served on 7/25/2024, answer due 8/15/2024. (Roman-Medina, Anibal) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Notice to Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/30 1:21 PM
NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE Thomas Kessler re: 8 Order on Motion to Appear PHV, : The Court has granted your pro hac vice application. In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link:[LINK:https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you] . (arg) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Notice to Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/30 1:19 PM
NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE Lisa M. Schweitzer re: 8 Order on Motion to Appear PHV, : The Court has granted your pro hac vice application. In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link:[LINK:https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you] . (arg) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/29 6:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Kessler on behalf of Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco (Kessler, Thomas) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/29 6:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa M Schweitzer on behalf of Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco (Schweitzer, Lisa) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion to Appear PHV
Mon 07/29 10:03 AM
ORDER granting:2 "Motion to Allow Lisa Schweitzer to Appear PHV"; granting:3 "Motion to Allow Thomas S. Kessler to Appear PHV." Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 7/29/2024. (ao) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Transfer Case
Fri 07/26 4:59 PM
MOTION to transfer case filed by Anibal Alejandro Roman-Medina on behalf of Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco. Responses due by 8/5/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Roman-Medina, Anibal) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/12 9:24 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Salvador J. Antonetti-Stutts on behalf of Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco (Antonetti-Stutts, Salvador) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/11 5:49 PM
Summons Issued as to Benworth Capital Partners LLC, Benworth Capital Partners PR LLC, Bernardo Navarro, Claudia Navarro. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (ad) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Thu 07/11 9:38 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan. (ad) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/10 5:49 PM
Motion to allow Thomas S. Kessler to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8742330) filed by Ubaldo M. Fernandez-Barrera on behalf of FEDERAL RESERVE BANK OF SAN FRANCISCO. Responses due by 7/24/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez-Barrera, Ubaldo) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/10 5:47 PM
Motion to allow Lisa Schweitzer to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8742319) filed by Ubaldo M. Fernandez-Barrera on behalf of FEDERAL RESERVE BANK OF SAN FRANCISCO. Responses due by 7/24/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez-Barrera, Ubaldo) |
|
1 | 1
33
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/10 5:35 PM
COMPLAINT against Benworth Capital Partners LLC, Benworth Capital Partners PR LLC, Bernardo Navarro, Claudia Navarro ( Filing fee $405 receipt number APRDC-8742195.), filed by FEDERAL RESERVE BANK OF SAN FRANCISCO. Service due by 10/8/2024,(Roman-Medina, Anibal) |
|
Att: 1 Category Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A-1, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A-2, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit A-3, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 8 2 pgs Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 9 Summons Benworth Capital Partners PR LLC, | ||
Att: 10 Summons Benworth Capital Partners LLC, | ||
Att: 11 Summons Bernardo Navarro, | ||
Att: 12 Summons Claudia Navarro |