Smith v. Doub et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Referred: | Molly H Cherry |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03900 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Document Mailed
Wed 07/17 11:26 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 Complaint filed by Paul Micheal Smith placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerk's Office to Paul Micheal Smith 8528 Chloe Lane N. Charleston, SC 29406. (agaz, ) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Report and Recommendation
Wed 07/17 11:25 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: It is recommended that this action be transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina for further handling. Objections to R&R due by 7/31/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 7/17/2024. (agaz, ) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Wed 07/10 4:13 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Paul Micheal Smith.(dgar) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 07/10 4:13 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Paul Micheal Smith. Motions referred to Molly H Cherry.(dgar) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/10 4:12 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Paul Micheal Smith. (dgar) |