California Central District Court
Judge:John F Walter
Referred: Pedro V Castillo
Case #: 2:24-mc-00084
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Jul 10, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
23 23 notice Withdrawal (Document or Motion) Tue 09/03 4:07 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Subpoena (AO 88) Issued5 filed by Movant PCR Distributing Co.. (Bjorgum, A)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
22 22 2 pgs order Order Tue 08/27 12:50 PM
ORDER SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND BRIEFING ON MOTION TO QUASH AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ON DMCA SUBPOENA by Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo, re Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time21 . Movant shall have until August 30, 2024 to file its response, and Intervenor shall have until September 13, 2024 to file its reply. (hr)
Related: [-]
21 21 stip Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 08/26 2:38 PM
Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Order on Motion to Intervene,,,, Order on Motion to Quash Trial Subpoena,,,, Order on Motion to Stay Order (other),,,17 filed by Movant PCR Distributing Co..(Bjorgum, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, August 16, 2024
20 20 order For Order Fri 08/16 12:42 PM
ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND BRIEFING ON MOTION TO QUASH AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ON DMCA SUBPOENA by Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo: granting19 First STIPULATION for Extension of Time. Movant shall have until August 23, 2024 to file its response, and Intervenor shall have until August 30, 2024 to file its reply. (hr)
Related: [-]
19 19 3 pgs motion Order Fri 08/16 12:54 AM
First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Briefing re Motion To Quash and Protective Order filed by Movant PCR Distributing Co..(Bjorgum, A) Modified on 8/16/2024 (mr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation
Monday, July 29, 2024
18 18 respm Declaration (Motion related) Mon 07/29 1:27 PM
DECLARATION of Jennifer M. Rynell Regarding Compliance with Court Order First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena for For Protective Order First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay pending the deadline associated with the subpoena 8 filed by Intervenor Nhentai.net. (Rynell, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
17 17 order Intervene Quash Trial Subpoena Stay Order (other) Fri 07/26 1:33 PM
[IN CHAMBERS] ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO INTERVENE, TO QUASH, FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, AND TO STAY DEADLINE8 by Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. The Motion is GRANTED IN PART. For good cause shown, Intervenors request to Intervene is GRANTED. The deadline for complying with the Subpoena is STAYED. Movant shall immediately (1) provide Respondent with a copy of this Order, (2) instruct Respondent that it should not comply with the Subpoena until further order of this Court, and (3) no later than July 29, 2024, file a declaration acknowledging that it has fully complied with this Order. The request to quash and for a protective order is TAKEN UNDER CONSIDERATION. Movant is given until August 9, 2024, to respond to Intervenor's motion to quash and for a protective order. Intervenor may file an optional reply no later than August 16, 2024. (tsn)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Declaration Fri 07/26 1:22 PM
DECLARATION of John T. Wilson As Lead Trial Counsel filed by Intervenor Nhentai.net. (Wilson, John)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Motions Referred Fri 07/26 9:30 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) REFERRAL ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The Court, on its own motion, hereby refers the Operators of Nhentai.net's Motion to Intervene, to Quash 512(h) Subpoena, for Protective Order, and to Stay Deadline8 , to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo for disposition. (iv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
14 14 22 pgs order Order Fri 07/26 7:55 AM
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Clerical Error (G-11) Thu 07/25 12:29 PM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form,,9 The Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application issued on 7/22/24 (doc 9) was issued in error. At the time of filing the application, there was no judge assigned to the case. (ak)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 07/25 12:02 PM
ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: granting7 Non-Resident Attorney John T. Wilson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Intervenor Nhentai.net, designating Glenn Litwak as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (ak)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 07/25 11:56 AM
ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: granting6 Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer M. Rynell APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Intervenor Nhentai.net, designating Glenn Litwak as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (ak)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 07/25 11:09 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form Mon 07/22 11:05 AM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John T Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Intervenor Nhentai.net (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37865757)7 , First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer M. Rynell to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Intervenor Nhentai.net (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37865453)6 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number incomplete; missing initials of Judge. (ak)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
8 8 motion Intervene Quash Trial Subpoena Stay Order (other) Fri 07/19 3:51 PM
First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene , First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena for For Protective Order , First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay pending the deadline associated with the subpoena filed by Intervenor Nhentai.net. (Litwak, Glenn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Wilson Decl ISO of Motion to Intervene Quash for Protective Order and Emer Motion to Stay Deadline,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Intervene, Quash, for Protection,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order - Staying Deadline for Compliance with Subpoena
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Fri 07/19 12:38 PM
First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John T Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Intervenor Nhentai.net (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37865757) filed by Intervenor Nhentai.net. (Litwak, Glenn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order G-64 John Wilson
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Fri 07/19 12:35 PM
First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer M. Rynell to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Intervenor Nhentai.net (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37865453) filed by Intervenor Nhentai.net. (Attorney Glenn T Litwak added to party Nhentai.net(pty:intv)) (Litwak, Glenn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order G-64 Proposed Order- Jennifer Rynell
Monday, July 15, 2024
5 5 service Subpoena (AO 88) Issued Mon 07/15 11:44 AM
SUBPOENA IN A CIVIL CASE issued as to Cloudflare, Inc. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
4 4 notice Subpoena Request (AO 88) Thu 07/11 1:05 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Subpoena filed by Movant PCR Distributing Co..(Bjorgum, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Subpoena,
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Subpoena
3 3 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Thu 07/11 12:27 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Subpoena Request (AO 88)2 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Date: line are not blank. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
2 2 notice Subpoena Request (AO 88) Wed 07/10 4:32 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Subpoena filed by Movant PCR Distributing Co..(Bjorgum, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Proposed Subpoena,
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Proposed Subpoena
1 1 cmp MISC - Subpoena to Identify Infringer (DMCA) Wed 07/10 4:22 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF DIGITAL MILLENNIUM COPYRIGHT ACT SUBPOENA Receipt No: ACACDC-37807229 - Fee: $52, filed by Movant PCR Distributing Co.. (Attorney A Eric Bjorgum added to party PCR Distributing Co.(pty:mov))(Bjorgum, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Adams Dec.,
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Adams Dec.