Surowiec v. AT&T Mobility LLC
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Cecilia M Altonaga |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-22619 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 8:24 AM EDT |
Defendant
AT&T Mobility LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carol Surowiec
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Status Report
Mon 08/26 1:44 PM
STATUS REPORT by AT&T Mobility LLC (Mercado Robles, Yameel) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Reopen Case
Fri 07/26 12:05 PM
ORDER denying8 Plaintiff, Carol Surowiec's Motion to Reopen Case. Defendant shall file status reports every thirty (30) days beginning August 26, 2024, advising of the status of the JPML's transfer decision. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/26/2024. See attached document for full details. (mee) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Status Report
Mon 07/22 4:59 PM
STATUS REPORT by AT&T Mobility LLC(Mercado Robles, Yameel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A | ||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 07/18 6:00 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re8 Plaintiff's MOTION to Reopen Case for Purposes of Filing Motion to Remand to State Court filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Replies due by 7/25/2024. (Mercado Robles, Yameel) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion to Remand to State Court
Mon 07/15 9:18 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying9 as premature Motion to Remand to State Court. If the Court grants the opposed Motion to Reopen [ECF No. 8], Plaintiff can then present its motion to remand. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Remand to State Court
Fri 07/12 4:57 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court by Carol Surowiec.(Udell, Maury) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Consumer Agreement | ||
8 | 8
motion
Reopen Case
Fri 07/12 4:56 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION to Reopen Case for Purposes of Filing Motion to Remand to State Court by Carol Surowiec. (Udell, Maury) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party
Thu 07/11 5:01 PM
ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/11/2024. See attached document for full details. (mee) |
|
6 | 6
order
Status Report Order
Thu 07/11 11:52 AM
ORDER. Counsel for the removing party is directed to file and serve a Removal Status Report no later than July 22, 2024. Failure to file a timely Removal Status Report shall be ground for remand. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/11/2024. See attached document for full details. Text Modified on 7/11/2024 (mee) |
|
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report
Thu 07/11 11:50 AM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report, certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements due by 7/22/2024. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/11/2024. See attached document for full details. (mee) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions
Thu 07/11 11:25 AM
Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by AT&T Mobility LLC (Mercado Robles, Yameel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 07/11 11:23 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by AT&T Mobility LLC identifying Other Affiliate SBC Long Distance LLC, Other Affiliate BellSouth Mobile Data, Inc, Other Affiliate AT&T Investment & Tower Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate New Cingular Wireless Services, Inc. for AT&T Mobility LLC (Mercado Robles, Yameel) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Thu 07/11 8:20 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ar24) |
|
1 | 1
13
pgs
cmp
Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint)
Wed 07/10 5:07 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17668165, filed by AT&T Mobility LLC.(Mercado Robles, Yameel) |
|
Att: 1 8 pgs Exhibit State Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit State Court Docket, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |