McCuin v. Pearl River County et al
Mississippi Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Halil S Ozerden |
Referred: | Bradley W Rath |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00212 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal) |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 08/15 11:40 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to NEFS re6 Motion and7 Amended Writ of Habeas Corpus. Mail sent to Jesse McCuin. ***NEFS re-mailed to Plaintiff to new address on docket*** (RLW) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Mon 08/12 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Jesse McCuin: Stone County Regional Correctional Facility, UCC 1-308, 1420 Industrial Park Road, Wiggins, MS 39577 (RLW) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Amended Writ of Habeas Corpus
Wed 08/07 4:04 PM
Amended Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jesse McCuin Related document:5 Order (RLW) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
6 | 6
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 08/07 3:30 PM
*RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jesse McCuin (RLW) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 07/26 10:40 AM
ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO FILE AN AMENDED HABEAS PETITION: Clerk directed to mail the form used to file a Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 for Writ of Habeas Corpus to Petitioner at his last know address of record. Petitioner on or before August 26, 2024, must complete and sign the form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath on 7/26/2024(wld) |
|
Att: 1 28 U.S.C. 2241 Form | ||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
3
pgs
order
Order
Thu 07/25 10:22 AM
ORDER: Ordered that on or before August 26, 2024, petitioner shall complete and file the attached application or pay the $5 filing fee. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath on 7/25/24. (JCH) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 07/10 4:52 PM
*RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jesse McCuin (RLW) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Wed 07/10 4:51 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jesse McCuin (RLW) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Assignment | ||
1 | 1
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 07/10 4:45 PM
ORDER: McCuin's habeas claims are severed from his claims under Sec. 1983. Clerk shall open a new civil action under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 2241 in the Southern Division. See Order for more details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. on 7/10/24. (RLW) |