Hewitt v. Total Transportation of Mississippi, LLC
Mississippi Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Kristi H Johnson |
Referred: | Michael T Parker |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00399 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination) |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 02, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 4:58 AM CDT |
Defendant
Total Transportation of Mississippi, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeremy Hewitt
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay Proceedings
Fri 08/02 4:18 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion to Stay Proceedings. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the Joint Motion for Entry of Agreed Order Staying Case and Transferring Plaintiff's Claims to Arbitration is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims shall be individually arbitrated pursuant to the Total Resolution Program. Signed by District Judge Kristi H. Johnson on 8/2/2024 (LAT) Modified on 8/2/2024 (LAT) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 08/02 12:57 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Total Transportation of Mississippi, LLC (Merritt, LaToya) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Stay Proceedings
Fri 08/02 12:39 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings : Joint Motion for Entry of Agreed Order Staying Case and Transferring Plaintiff's Claims to Arbitration by Total Transportation of Mississippi, LLC(Merritt, LaToya) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" Total Resolution Program and Rules for Arbitration (the Program), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit "B" Arbitration Program Agreement signed by the Plaintiff | ||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 07/22 8:15 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeremy Hewitt. Total Transportation of Mississippi, LLC served on 7/12/2024, answer due 8/2/2024. (Watson, Louis) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/11 11:11 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Nicholas Norris on behalf of Jeremy Hewitt (Norris, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/10 4:32 PM
Summons Issued as to Total Transportation of Mississippi, LLC. (CO) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/10 4:26 PM
COMPLAINT against Total Transportation of Mississippi, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMSSDC-5447182), filed by Jeremy Hewitt.(CO) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - EEOC Charge, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - EEOC RTS, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |