Rayam v. Evolve Bank & Trust
Tennessee Western District Court | |
Judge: | Sheryl H Lipman |
Referred: | Tu M Pham |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-02494 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 4:58 AM CDT |
Defendant
Evolve Bank & Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bharath Rayam
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Mon 08/26 2:11 PM
ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE TO DELAY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE UNTIL RULING FROM THE JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION ON PENDING MOTION FOR TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 1407 AND FINDING AS MOOT18 MOTION TO STAY. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 8/26/2024. (shl) |
|
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Stay
Fri 08/23 5:09 PM
MOTION to Stay (Proposed Order Submitted) by Evolve Bank & Trust.(Schrack, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Consultation | ||
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/20 7:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amisha R Patel on behalf of Evolve Bank & Trust (Patel, Amisha) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 08/01 2:32 PM
ORDER GRANTING15 DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 8/1/2024. (shl) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 07/30 1:39 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint (Proposed Order Submitted) by Evolve Bank & Trust. (Schrack, Andrew) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 07/30 1:39 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Evolve Bank & Trust identifying Corporate Parent Evolve Bancorp, inc. for Evolve Bank & Trust.. (Schrack, Andrew) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/30 1:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew B Schrack on behalf of Evolve Bank & Trust (Schrack, Andrew) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/30 12:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel W. Van Horn on behalf of Evolve Bank & Trust (Van Horn, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/23 1:39 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (shl) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 07/23 1:05 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bharath Rayam as to Evolve Bank & Trust. (Honeycutt, Alexandra) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Certificate
Tue 07/23 12:42 PM
Certificate of of Good Standing by Bharath Rayam. (Federman, William) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Deficiency Notice
Fri 07/12 1:21 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-4456414) filed by Bharath Rayam has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Local Rule 7.2(a)(1)(B) requires all motions to be accompanied by a certificate of consultation - one from a district court and one from the highest court where you have been admitted to practice. This motion will be termed pending correct submission. You can bypass the payment screen stating fee previously paid. Please refer to the[LINK:ECF User Manual] and[LINK:ECF Policies and Procedures] . The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jae) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 07/12 10:22 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-4456414) by Bharath Rayam.(Federman, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit List of Courts Admitted In | ||
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/11 9:10 AM
Summons Issued as to Evolve Bank & Trust. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge
Thu 07/11 9:09 AM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice LR 16.2
Thu 07/11 9:08 AM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) |
|
3 | 3
notice
ADR Compliance
Thu 07/11 9:08 AM
NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 07/11 9:05 AM
Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae) |
|
1 | 1
48
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/10 5:43 PM
COMPLAINT against Evolve Bank & Trust (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNWDC-4454941), filed by Bharath Rayam.(Honeycutt, Alexandra) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons |