Libin-Fitzpatrick v. Sparks et al
Utah District Court | |
Judge: | Tena Campbell |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00491 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/29 1:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Frank D. Mylar on behalf of Davis County (Mylar, Frank) |
|
misc
Received Consent /Reassignment Form
Mon 07/29 3:32 PM
RECEIVED Magistrate Availability Form from Defendant Davis County. (mh) |
||
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction
Thu 07/11 9:33 AM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice emailed or mailed to Plaintiff Cathy Libin-Fitzpatrick. (Notice generated by Clerk's Office) Form due by 8/1/2024. (sg) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Civil Cover Sheet JS44
Thu 07/11 9:28 AM
Civil Cover Sheet (JS44) re1 Complaint Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts[LINK:PDF version] and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance, filed by Cathy Libin-Fitzpatrick. (Mason, Walter) |
|
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Thu 07/11 9:03 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re1 Complaint. The Civil Cover Sheet is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule DUCivR3-4. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet JS44 immediately. (sg) |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 07/11 9:33 AM
Judge Tena Campbell added. Case number will now read 2:24-cv-00491-TC. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (sg) |
||
misc
Received Consent /Reassignment Form
Thu 07/11 10:00 AM
RECEIVED Magistrate Availability Form from Plaintiff Cathy Libin-Fitzpatrick. (mh) |
||
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 07/10 4:40 PM
NOTICE of Undertaking by Cathy Libin-Fitzpatrick (Mason, Walter) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 07/10 4:39 PM
NOTICE of Bond by Cathy Libin-Fitzpatrick (Mason, Walter) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Atty)
Wed 07/10 4:34 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with filing fee previously paid filed by Cathy Libin-Fitzpatrick. (Mason, Walter) |