Never Forget Brands, LLC
South Carolina Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Elisabetta Gm Gasparini |
Case #: | 2:24-bk-02470 |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Never Forget Brands, LLC
2202 Waterway Blvd
Isle of Palms, SC 29451-2318 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee's Office
Strom Thurmond Federal Building 1835 Assembly St. Suite 953
Columbia, SC 29201 |
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 12:02 PM EDT |
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
court
Hearing Held
Thu 09/05 11:42 AM
Hearing Held relating to: Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor 2550 Summerville Property Owner, LLC. Consent Order Due from Christine Brimm and Alexandra Glunt by 9/12/2024. (Beaulieu, N) |
|
33 | 33
misc
Notice of Change of Address - No PDF Required
Thu 09/05 7:51 AM
Notice of Change of Address. CREDITOR to be changed: Marc Donati, 303 East Main Street, Saint Charles, IL 60174-2057 CORRECTED CREDITOR INFORMATION: Marc Donati, 3000 Kirkwood Avenue, Geargetown, IN 47122 Filed by Mary M. Caskey of Haynsworth Sinkler Boyd, PA on behalf of Marc Donati. (Caskey, Mary) |
|
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
answer
Objection
Wed 09/04 9:17 AM
Objection to Motion to Convert Case From 11 to 7 filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee's Office with Certificate of Service Filed by Never Forget Brands, LLC . (Brimm, Christine) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 08/27 1:22 PM
Certificate of Service RE: Application for Compensation. The filing party has verified that parties required to receive notice have received notice by Notice of Electronic Filing and has provided notice to other parties listed in the attached Certificate of Service. Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Barton Brimm, PA. . (Brimm, Christine) |
|
30 | 30
motion
Compensation (Application)
Tue 08/27 12:16 PM
Application for Compensation, for Barton Brimm, PA, Debtor's Attorney, period: 7/10/2024 to 8/22/2024, fee: $10,945.00, expenses: $17.00. Filed by Christine E Brimm. Hearing scheduled for 9/25/2024 at 02:00 PM at Charleston. Date Served 8/27/2024. Last day for objections is 09/17/2024. (Brimm, Christine) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report
Wed 08/21 3:36 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: July 31, 2024 Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Never Forget Brands, LLC. (Brimm, Christine) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
crditcrd
Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet
Fri 08/16 1:00 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Motion to Convert Case From 11 to 7([LINK 24-02470 eg] ) [motion,mc11to7] ( 15.00). Receipt Number VOID, amount 15.00. Filing fee is not due from the UST. (Dillard) |
||
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 08/15 3:38 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice with Certificate of Service Filed by Jody A. Bedenbaugh of Nelson, Mullins, Riley and Scarborough on behalf of Kraft Sports and Entertainment, LLC. (Bedenbaugh, Jody) |
|
27 | 27
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 08/15 10:14 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by David Brian Wheeler on behalf of Triton Real Estate Holdings, LLC. (Wheeler, David) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Convert Case 11 to 7
Thu 08/15 9:24 AM
Motion to Convert Chapter 11 Case to Chapter 7. with Certificate of Service Filed by Brandon K. Poston of US Trustee's Office on behalf of US Trustee's Office. Hearing scheduled for 9/25/2024 at 02:00 PM at Charleston. Date Served 8/14/2024. Objections due by 9/4/2024. (Poston, Brandon) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
25 | 25
misc
Withdrawal of Document
Thu 08/15 9:20 AM
Withdrawal of Motion Reason for Withdrawal: Motion to Convert filed under incorrect event. Motion will be refiled. Filed by Brandon K. Poston of US Trustee's Office on behalf of US Trustee's Office. . (Poston, Brandon) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 08/14 10:43 AM
Certificate of Service RE: Motion filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee's Office. The filing party has verified that parties required to receive notice have received notice by Notice of Electronic Filing and has provided notice to other parties listed in the attached Certificate of Service. Filed by Brandon K. Poston of US Trustee's Office on behalf of US Trustee's Office. . (Poston, Brandon) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Motion
Wed 08/14 9:36 AM
Motion of United States Trustee to Convert Case to a Case Under Chapter 7 Filed by Brandon K. Poston of US Trustee's Office on behalf of US Trustee's Office. (Poston, Brandon) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
answer
Objection
Mon 08/12 2:26 PM
Objection to Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor 2550 Summerville Property Owner, LLC with Certificate of Service Filed by Never Forget Brands, LLC . (Brimm, Christine) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Mon 08/12 11:54 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice with Certificate of Service Filed by Mary M. Caskey of Haynsworth Sinkler Boyd, PA on behalf of Marc Donati. (Caskey, Mary) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Mon 08/12 11:03 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Adam J. Floyd of Beal, LLC on behalf of Community Bankshares, Inc. (Floyd, Adam) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
trustee
Meeting of Creditors Held - Telephonic Meeting
Fri 08/09 11:40 AM
Telephonic Meeting of Creditors Held and Examination of Debtor on 08/09/2024. Filed by US Trustee's Office. (Poston, Brandon) |
||
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 08/02 9:38 AM
Certificate of Service RE: Order on Application to Employ. The filing party has verified that parties required to receive notice have received notice by Notice of Electronic Filing and has provided notice to other parties listed in the attached Certificate of Service. Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Never Forget Brands, LLC. . (Brimm, Christine) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice
Thu 08/01 4:39 PM
Notice of Verified Statement of Secured Creditor Representation . Notice and service of this event are delegated pursuant to the Local Rules. Filed by J. Ronald Jones Jr. of Smith Debnam Narron Drake Saintsing & My on behalf of Patricia Clarke, Patricia LoPresti, Bonnie Matthew. (Jones, J.) |
|
17 | 17
order
Employ (Application)
Thu 08/01 4:29 PM
Order Authorizing Employment Of Barton Brimm, PA As Bankruptcy Counsel For Debtor . Notice and service of this event are delegated pursuant to the Local Rules (Montgomery, S) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 08/01 3:13 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice with Certificate of Service Filed by J. Ronald Jones Jr. of Smith Debnam Narron Drake Saintsing & My on behalf of Patricia LoPresti, Bonnie Matthew, Patricia Clarke, William Seelbach, Kathryn Tatum. (Jones, J.) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Relief from Stay
Mon 07/29 11:10 AM
Motion for Relief from Stay, Hearing Notice and Certificate of Service RE: 2550 West Fifth North Street, Building 13, Summerville, SC 29483. Filed by Alexandra Cassidy Glunt of Haynsworth Sinkler Boyd, PA on behalf of 2550 Summerville Property Owner, LLC. Date Served 7/29/2024. Last day for objections is 8/12/2024. Hearing scheduled for 9/5/2024 at 10:30 AM at Charleston. (Glunt, Alexandra) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Lease Agreement | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Lease Termination | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
crditcrd
Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet
Mon 07/29 11:14 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Motion for Relief From Stay([LINK 24-02470 eg] ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00). Receipt Number A13981710, amount 199.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 07/26 9:50 AM
Certificate of Service RE: Meeting of Creditors. The filing party has verified that parties required to receive notice have received notice by Notice of Electronic Filing and has provided notice to other parties listed in the attached Certificate of Service. Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Never Forget Brands, LLC. . (Brimm, Christine) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Notice of Change of Address - No PDF Required
Fri 07/26 9:27 AM
Notice of Change of Address. CREDITOR to be changed: Louisiana Workforce Commission, P.O. Box 94050, Frankfort, KY 40601 CORRECTED CREDITOR INFORMATION: Louisiana Workforce Commission, P.O. Box 94050, Baton Rouge, LA 70804 Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Never Forget Brands, LLC. (Brimm, Christine) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 07/16 5:21 PM
Certificate of Service RE: Meeting of Creditors. The filing party has verified that parties required to receive notice have received notice by Notice of Electronic Filing and has provided notice to other parties listed in the attached Certificate of Service. Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Never Forget Brands, LLC. . (Brimm, Christine) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Notice of Change of Address - No PDF Required
Tue 07/16 3:18 PM
Notice of Change of Address. CREDITOR to be changed: Impress DC Media, Inc., 5100 NW 17th Avenue, Miami, FL 33142 CORRECTED CREDITOR INFORMATION: Impress DC Media, Inc., P.O. Box 371155, Miami, FL 33137 Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Never Forget Brands, LLC. (Brimm, Christine) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Notice of Change of Address - No PDF Required
Tue 07/16 3:16 PM
Notice of Change of Address. CREDITOR to be changed: Brand Muscle, Inc., 233 South Wacker Drive, Suite 5650, Chicago, IL 60606 CORRECTED CREDITOR INFORMATION: Brand Muscle, Inc., 1500 West 3rd Street, Suite 325, Cleveland, OH 44113 Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Never Forget Brands, LLC. (Brimm, Christine) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Notice of Change of Address - No PDF Required
Tue 07/16 3:11 PM
Notice of Change of Address. CREDITOR to be changed: Amcor Flexibles Capsules Canada, Inc., 2301 Route 112, St-Cesaire JOL ITO CORRECTED CREDITOR INFORMATION: Amcor Flexibles Capsules Canada, Inc., 2301 Route 112, St-Cesaire, Quebec JOL 1TO Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Never Forget Brands, LLC. (Brimm, Christine) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Mon 07/15 11:31 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice with Certificate of Service Filed by Tara E. Nauful of Best Law, P.A. on behalf of Scott C. Pierce. (Nauful, Tara) |
|
Saturday, July 13, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
court
Certificate of Service BNC Meeting of Creditors
Sun 07/14 12:22 AM
Certificate of Service of Meeting of Creditors Notice as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Notice Date 07/13/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Change of Address
Fri 07/12 2:52 PM
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Never Forget Brands, LLC. (Brimm, Christine) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
court
Meeting of Creditors
Thu 07/11 4:16 PM
Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors. Document Served. 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/9/2024 at 09:30 AM at Telephone - 341. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 10/8/2024. Proofs of Claims due by 11/7/2024. (Barnello, P) |
|
3 | 3
5
pgs
motion
Employ (Application)
Thu 07/11 9:23 AM
Application to Employ Barton Brimm, PA as Attorney for Debtor with Affidavit of Professional Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Never Forget Brands, LLC. (Brimm, Christine) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Debtor's Election Re: Electronic Noticing
Wed 07/10 3:48 PM
Debtor's Request to Decline Electronic Noticing. DOCUMENT IMAGE AVAILABLE ONLY TO COURT USERS AND THE TRUSTEE/US TRUSTEE. Filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Never Forget Brands, LLC. (Brimm, Christine) |
|
1 | 1
73
pgs
caseupld
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (case upload only)
Wed 07/10 2:58 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Schedules and Statements. Non-Individual filed by Christine E Brimm of Barton Brimm, PA on behalf of Never Forget Brands, LLC. (Brimm, Christine) |
|
crditcrd
Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet
Wed 07/10 3:05 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (case upload only)([LINK 24-02470 ) [caseupld,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A13956768, amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |