Montgomery Bey v. Leonard et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael L Brown |
Referred: | Walter E Johnson |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-03047 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property |
Case Filed: | Jul 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 6:26 AM EDT |
Defendant
Jane Doe
4665 Riverview Road
Sandy Springs, GA 30327 |
|
Defendant
John Doe
and other occupants 4665 Riverview Road
Sandy Springs, GA 30327 |
|
Defendant
Debbie Leonard
|
|
Plaintiff
Queen Akhenaten II Montgomery Bey
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Filing
Thu 09/05 3:25 PM
NOTICE Of Filing ("Order Notice of Default Judgment") by Queen Akhenaten II Montgomery Bey. (pdt) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Filing
Fri 08/09 3:00 PM
NOTICE Of Filing ("Order Notice of Default Judgment") by Queen Akhenaten II Montgomery Bey. (pdt) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Filing
Thu 08/08 10:21 AM
NOTICE Of Filing by Queen Akhenaten II Montgomery Bey. (pdt) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Fact, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit of Financial Statement | ||
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
utility
Submission to District Judge
Fri 08/02 11:48 AM
Submission of3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (jpk) |
||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
3
pgs
order
Order for Service of Report and Recommendation
Mon 07/15 11:38 AM
ORDER for Service of3 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 7/15/24. (klb) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Report and Recommendation - Final
Mon 07/15 11:35 AM
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Queen Akhenaten II Montgomery Bey. Pursuant to Local Rule 41.2(B), [t]he failure... of a party appearing pro se to keep the clerk's office informed of any change in address and/or telephone number which causes a delay or otherwise adversely affects the management of the case shall constitute grounds either for dismissal of the action without prejudice.... N.D. Ga. Civ. R. 41.2(b). Here, the information provided in the IFP Application is insufficient to judge plaintiff's status as a pauper. However, the Court cannot communicate that deficiency to plaintiff because she has failed to provide the Clerk with a mailing address or telephone number. Accordingly, the undersigned RECOMMENDS that the IFP Application be DENIED and this case be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 7/15/24. (klb) |
|
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 07/15 11:39 AM
NOTICE re3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and4 Order for Service of final Report and Recommendation. Clerk did not mail copies. Pro Se Plaintiff refused to give her mailing address. (klb) |
||
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Filing
Fri 07/12 4:01 PM
Amended Affidavit of fact by Queen Akhenaten II Montgomery Bey. (pdt) |
|
utility
Docket Correction
Wed 07/10 9:47 AM
Notification of Docket Correction. Case assigned wrong case number in error, correct case number is 1:24-cv-3047-MLB-WEJ (dgr) |
||
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 07/10 9:40 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Queen Akhenaten II Montgomery Bey.(dgr) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Wed 07/10 9:42 AM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (dgr) |