Simon v. Grady Memorial Hospital Corporation
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas W Thrash, Jr |
Referred: | Justin S Anand |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-03048 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race) |
Case Filed: | Jul 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 6:27 AM EDT |
Defendant
Grady Memorial Hospital Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Avis Simon
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 08/05 10:54 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Avis Simon. Grady Memorial Hospital Corporation waiver mailed on 7/30/2024, answer due 9/30/2024. (Abbarno, Kenneth) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/31 11:06 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric S. Fisher on behalf of Grady Memorial Hospital Corporation (Fisher, Eric) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
misc
Approval of Application for Admission PHV
Mon 07/15 2:43 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:8 APPLICATION for Admission of Kenneth P. Abbarno Pro Hac Vice APPLICATION for Admission of Kenneth P. Abbarno Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13564883). Attorney Kenneth P. Abbarno added appearing on behalf of Avis Simon. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (esr) |
||
misc
Approval of Application for Admission PHV
Mon 07/15 2:45 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:9 APPLICATION for Admission of Sara D. Aguiniga Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13564948). Attorney Sara Aguiniga added appearing on behalf of Avis Simon. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (esr) |
||
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 07/12 3:58 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Sara D. Aguiniga Pro Hac Vice.by Avis Simon. (Perkins, Kimberly) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 07/12 3:57 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Kenneth P. Abbarno Pro Hac Vice.by Avis Simon. (Perkins, Kimberly) |
|
misc
Return of Application for Admission PHV
Fri 07/12 1:42 PM
RETURN of6 APPLICATION for Admission of Kenneth P. Abbarno Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13564883) to attorney for correction. Reason for Return: Local counsel must file applications. Please correct and resubmit. (esr) |
||
misc
Return of Application for Admission PHV
Fri 07/12 1:45 PM
RETURN of7 APPLICATION for Admission of Sara D. Aguiniga Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13564948) to attorney for correction. Reason for Return: (1) Local counsel must file application. (2) Applicant must provide a list of courts they are admitted to. Please correct and resubmit. (esr) |
||
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 07/11 11:49 AM
APPLICATION for Admission of Sara D. Aguiniga Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13564948).by Avis Simon. (Abbarno, Kenneth) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 07/11 11:43 AM
APPLICATION for Admission of Kenneth P. Abbarno Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13564883).by Avis Simon. (Abbarno, Kenneth) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Letter re:83.1
Wed 07/10 3:42 PM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Sara Aguiniga. Clerk to follow-up by 7/22/2024. (cpp) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Letter re:83.1
Wed 07/10 10:10 AM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Kenneth P. Abbarno. Clerk to follow-up by 7/22/2024. (cpp) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Letter re:83.1
Wed 07/10 10:08 AM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Diandra Sima Debrosse Zimmermann. Clerk to follow-up by 7/22/2024. (cpp) |
|
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Wed 07/10 9:37 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Grady Memorial Hospital Corporation. (pdt) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
30+
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/10 9:35 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Avis Simon. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13559834) (pdt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |